EP3646900 - ENDOSCOPE FLEXIBLE TUBE, ENDOSCOPE-TYPE MEDICAL DEVICE, RESIN COMPOSITION FOR COATING ENDOSCOPE FLEXIBLE TUBE SUBSTRATE, AND RESIN COMPOSITION SET FOR COATING ENDOSCOPE FLEXIBLE TUBE SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2020/19] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUKAWA, Kazushi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
NAKAI, Yoshihiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18825075.7 | 29.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018JP24966 | Priority number, date | JP20170129905 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017129905 | [2020/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019004473 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3646900 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/06, A61B1/005, A61L31/12, C08J7/04, C08K5/3435, C08K5/372, C08L67/00, C08L75/04, C08L77/12, F16L11/08, F16L11/10, G02B23/24, A61L29/08, B32B27/36 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
A61B1/00078 (EP,US);
A61B1/005 (EP,US);
A61L29/085 (EP);
A61L31/06 (EP);
A61L31/12 (EP);
B29C48/09 (EP);
B29C48/151 (EP);
B29C48/21 (EP);
B29C48/34 (EP);
B29C48/92 (EP);
B32B1/08 (EP);
B32B15/02 (EP);
B32B15/08 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08K5/3435 (EP);
C08K5/372 (EP);
C08K5/52 (EP);
C08L75/04 (EP);
C08L77/12 (EP);
C09D167/00 (US);
C09D167/025 (EP);
C09D175/04 (US);
C09D7/63 (US);
F16L11/08 (US);
F16L11/10 (EP,US);
G02B23/24 (EP);
A61L2420/06 (EP);
A61L2420/08 (EP);
B29C2948/9259 (EP);
B32B2307/51 (EP);
B32B2307/536 (EP);
B32B2307/714 (EP);
B32B2535/00 (EP);
F16L11/088 (EP);
F16L55/11 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L29/085, C08L67/02 (EP);
C08K5/3435, C08L67/025 (EP);
C08K5/372, C08L67/025 (EP);
C08K5/52, C08L67/025 (EP);
C09D167/025, C08K5/3435, C08L75/04 (EP);
C09D167/025, C08K5/3435, C08L77/06 (EP);
C09D167/025, C08K5/3435, C08L77/12 (EP);
C09D167/025, C08K5/372, C08L75/04 (EP);
C09D167/025, C08K5/372, C08L77/06 (EP);
C09D167/025, C08K5/52, C08L75/04 (EP); |
Former IPC [2020/19] | A61L31/06, A61B1/005, A61L31/12, C08J7/04, C08K5/3435, C08K5/372, C08L67/00, C08L75/04, C08L77/12, F16L11/08, F16L11/10, G02B23/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | ENDOSKOPSCHLAUCH, ENDOSKOPARTIGES MEDIZINPRODUKT, HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BESCHICHTUNG EINES ENDOSKOPSCHLAUCHSUBSTRATS UND HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNGSSET ZUR BESCHICHTUNG EINES ENDOSKOPSCHLAUCHSUBSTRATS | [2020/19] | English: | ENDOSCOPE FLEXIBLE TUBE, ENDOSCOPE-TYPE MEDICAL DEVICE, RESIN COMPOSITION FOR COATING ENDOSCOPE FLEXIBLE TUBE SUBSTRATE, AND RESIN COMPOSITION SET FOR COATING ENDOSCOPE FLEXIBLE TUBE SUBSTRATE | [2020/19] | French: | TUBE SOUPLE D'ENDOSCOPE, DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL DE TYPE ENDOSCOPE, COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE POUR LE REVÊTEMENT D'UN SUBSTRAT DE TUBE SOUPLE D'ENDOSCOPE, ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DURCIE POUR LE REVÊTEMENT D'UN SUBSTRAT DE TUBE SOUPLE D'ENDOSCOPE | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2020 | Translation filed | 09.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 18.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH11158362 (TORAY DU PONT KK) [X] 12,13 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0036] , [ 0042] *[I] 14,15; | [XAI]EP2980466 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 12,13 * claims 1, 11, 14 * * pages 31-32, paragraph 142 * * page 19; tables I-1-1 * * page 21; tables 1-2 * [A] 8,9 [I] 1-7,10,11 | International search | [A]JPH02283346 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-15 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008507632 (CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.) [A] 1-15* , paragraph [0027] & WO 2006/008256 A1, page 17, paragraph [0003] to the last paragraph & US 2006/0020066 A1 & EP 1774071 A1 & CN 1989279 A *; | [A]JP2011072391 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-15 * & US 2012/0180896 A1 & WO 2011/040215 A1 & EP 2484269 A1 & CN 102548462 A *; | [Y]JP2011527357 (BASF SE) [Y] 8-11 * , paragraphs [0266]-[0298] & WO 2010/003809 A2, page 51, paragraph [0002] to page 61, bottom line & EP 2313421 A2 & US 2010/0240810 A1 & CN 102089316 A *; | [A]WO2012053341 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , paragraph [0027] & CN 103080785 A *; | [XY]JP2014188217 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-15 * , claims 1-12, paragraphs [0034]-[0035], [0044]-[0067], tables 1-1 to 3-2 & EP 2980466 A1, claims 1-27, paragraphs [0059]-[0060], [0114]-[0149], Tables 1-1-1 to 1-3-2 & US 2016/0024343 A1 & WO 2014/157375 A1 & CN 105074306 A * [Y] 8-11; | [A]JP2015016261 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-15 * & US 2016/0024343 A1 & WO 2014/157375 A1 & EP 2980466 A1 & CN 105074306 A *; | [A]JP2015154924 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-15 * & US 2015/0202352 A1 & EP 2896635 A1 & CN 104784811 A * | by applicant | JP2011072391 | JP2011527357 | JP2014188217 | JP2015016261 | JP2017129905 |