EP3650480 - POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION FOR OPTICAL MATERIALS AND MOLDED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-1, Yaesu 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0028 / JP | [2023/18] |
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7122 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASORI, Yuuki c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc. 30 Asamutamachi Omuta-shi Fukuoka 836-8610 / JP | 02 /
KAWAGUCHI, Masaru c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc. 30 Asamutamachi Omuta-shi Fukuoka 836-8610 / JP | 03 /
KAWATO, Nobuo c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc. 30 Asamutamachi Omuta-shi Fukuoka 836-8610 / JP | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 18827462.5 | 02.07.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018JP25015 | Priority number, date | JP20170130119 | 03.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017130119 | JP20180100565 | 25.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018100565 | [2020/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019009230 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650480 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/48, C08G18/66, C09K9/02, G02B1/04, G02C7/10, C08G18/38, C08G18/42, C08G18/75, C08G18/76, C08K5/521, C08K5/526, C08L75/00 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
C08G18/7642 (EP);
C08K5/524 (US);
C08G18/3868 (EP);
C08G18/3876 (EP);
C08G18/4277 (EP);
C08G18/4841 (EP);
C08G18/6633 (EP);
C08G18/6666 (EP);
C08G18/758 (EP);
C08K5/1545 (EP,US);
C08K5/357 (US);
C08K5/526 (EP);
C08L75/00 (EP);
C09K9/02 (EP);
G02B1/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/1545, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08K5/526, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08L75/00, C08K5/521, C08K5/526 (EP);
G02B1/041, C08L75/04 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/20] | C08G18/08, C08G18/48, C08G18/66, C09K9/02, G02B1/04, G02C7/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Title | German: | POLYMERISIERBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR OPTISCHE MATERIALIEN UND FORMKÖRPER | [2020/20] | English: | POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION FOR OPTICAL MATERIALS AND MOLDED BODY | [2020/20] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMÉRISABLE POUR MATÉRIAUX OPTIQUES, ET CORPS MOULÉ | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2019 | Translation filed | 30.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.12.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5246630 (SELVIG CHRISTOPHER D [US]) [X] 9-11* example 2; claims 1,16 *; | [X]US2004021941 (IORI GIUSEPPE [IT], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0021]; example 1; claims 21,22 *; | [X]JP2005181426 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO, et al) [X] 1-18 * examples 1-4; claim 6 *; | [X]JP2005215640 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO, et al) [X] 1-18 * examples 1-5; claim 8 *; | [X]WO2006049786 (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * example 1 *; | [X]US2008225400 (SWARUP SHANTI [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * examples 1-3; table 5 *; | [X]US2010209697 (BOWLES STEVEN E [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0226] - [0236] - [0254] - [0256] - [ 274] , [0276] *; | [X]WO2010105123 (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * examples 1,2 *; | [X]US2011279883 (KUMAR ANIL [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0633] - [0637] *; | [X]US2012120473 (KUMAR ANIL [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0473] - [0488] *; | [X]WO2012071237 (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * examples 1-3 *; | [X]US2012145973 (BANCROFT KEVIN E [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0361] - [0366] *; | [X]US2013274412 (HICKENBOTH CHARLES R [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * table 2 *; | [X]WO2015077177 (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * table 1 *; | [X]WO2017030545 (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * examples 1,8 * | International search | [Y]JP2014015624 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [Y] 1-31* , claims 1, 9, paragraphs [0005], [0098], example 20 & US 2011/0224371 A1, claims 1, 9, paragraphs [0004], [0162], example 20 & EP 2357207 A1 & CN 102245666 A & KR 10-2011-0091005 A *; | [Y]WO2017047745 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [Y] 1-31 * , claims 1-23, paragraph [0149], example 31 & CN 108026240 A & KR 10-2018-0041180 A * | by applicant | US5221721 | JPH05295358 | JPH08272036 | JP2005023238 | JP2008030439 | JP2008143872 | WO2009146509 | WO2010020770 | WO2010067489 | JP2011144181 | WO2012149599 | WO2012162725 | WO2013078086 | WO2014002844 | WO2015115648 | WO2017047744 | WO2017047745 | WO2017047742 | WO2017047743 | JP2017130119 | JP2018100565 | - P. ALEXANDRIDIST.A. HATTON, Colloids Surfaces A: Physicochem. Eng. Aspects, (19950000), vol. 96, pages 1 - 46 |