EP3650569 - HOT-ROLLED STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Mitsuru c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
KOJIMA, Nobusato c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
KANZAWA, Yuuki c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 04 /
KAMIYA, Kohhei c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/20] | 01 /
YOSHIDA Mitsuru c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
02 /
KOJIMA Nobusato c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | |||
03 /
KANZAWA Yuuki c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | |||
04 /
KAMIYA Kohhei c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 18828857.5 | 06.07.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018JP25687 | Priority number, date | JP20170133889 | 07.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017133889 | [2020/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019009410 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650569 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3650569 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C21D9/46, C22C38/14, C22C38/58, C21D6/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/08, C22C38/12, C22C38/16, C22C38/22, C23C2/06, B32B15/01 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (KR,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR,US);
C21D6/005 (EP);
C21D6/008 (EP);
C21D8/0205 (EP,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/08 (EP);
C22C38/12 (EP);
C22C38/14 (EP);
C22C38/16 (EP);
C22C38/22 (EP);
C22C38/42 (KR,US);
C22C38/44 (KR,US);
C22C38/46 (US);
C22C38/48 (US);
C22C38/50 (US);
C22C38/54 (US);
B32B15/013 (EP);
C21D2211/002 (EP,KR,US);
C21D2211/005 (EP,US);
C21D2211/008 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/20] | C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C21D9/46, C22C38/14, C22C38/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEISSGEWALZTES STAHLBLECH UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/20] | English: | HOT-ROLLED STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2020/20] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER LAMINÉE À CHAUD ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2019 | Translation filed | 09.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 01.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016369383 (TODA YURI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * steel type J1;; tables 1-5 * * paragraphs [0116] , [ 190] - [0200] - [ 230]; claims 1-6 *; | [AD]WO2017085841 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [AD] 1-8* paragraphs [0032] - [0037]; claims 1,2; tables 1-3 * | International search | [A]WO2012133540 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * & US 2014/0000765 A1 & EP 2692893 A1 *; | [A]WO2012133563 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * & US 2014/0000765 A1 & EP 2692895 A1 *; | [A]WO2012133636 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * & US 2013/0319582 A1 & EP 2692894 A1 *; | [A]WO2012141265 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * & US 2014/0030546 A1 & EP 2698440 A1 *; | [A]WO2012141290 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * & US 2014/0014237 A1 & EP 2698444 A1 *; | [A]WO2012144567 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * & US 2014/0044989 A1 & EP 2700728 A1 *; | [A]WO2012161248 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * & US 2014/0110022 A1 & EP 2716783 A1 *; | [A]WO2012161241 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * & US 2014/0087208 A1 & EP 2716782 A1 *; | [A]WO2013047819 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * & US 2014/0242415 A1 & EP 2762588 A1 *; | [A]WO2013125399 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * & US 2015/0027593 A1 & EP 2818568 A1 *; | [A]WO2015162932 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * & US 2017/0044638 A1 & EP 3135788 A1 *; | [A]JP2016008310 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [A] 1-8* (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2008255484 | JP2009084648 | JP2014205890 | WO2017085841 | JP2017133889 |