EP3654447 - BATTERY SYSTEM AND MOVING BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Softbank Corp. 1-9-1 Higashi-shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7317 / JP | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAJIKA Akihiko c/o SoftBank Corp. 1-9-1 Higashi-shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7317 / JP | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18832707.6 | 18.06.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018JP23171 | Priority number, date | JP20170137226 | 13.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017137226 | [2020/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019012922 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654447 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M12/08, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H01M10/613, H01M10/615, H01M10/625, H01M10/633, H01M10/6563, H01M10/6571, H01M10/658, H01M4/38, H01M10/46, H01M50/249 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
H01M10/465 (EP);
H01M12/08 (EP,KR,US);
H01M12/02 (US);
B60L50/64 (US);
B60L53/51 (US);
B60L58/27 (US);
B64D27/24 (US);
H01M10/425 (KR);
H01M10/44 (EP,KR);
H01M10/48 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/486 (KR);
H01M10/613 (EP);
H01M10/615 (EP,KR);
H01M10/625 (EP,KR);
H01M10/633 (EP);
H01M10/6563 (EP);
H01M10/657 (KR);
H01M10/6571 (EP);
H01M10/658 (EP,KR);
H01M4/382 (EP);
H01M50/1385 (KR);
H01M50/249 (EP);
H01M8/04089 (KR);
H01M8/04201 (KR);
H01M8/04708 (KR);
H01M8/04753 (KR);
B60L2200/10 (US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | H01M12/08, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H01M10/613, H01M10/615, H01M10/625, H01M10/633, H01M10/6563, H01M10/6571, H01M10/658 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | BATTERIESYSTEM UND BEWEGLICHER KÖRPER | [2020/21] | English: | BATTERY SYSTEM AND MOVING BODY | [2020/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE ET CORPS MOBILE | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2020 | Translation filed | 29.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 10.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH08510085 (AER ENERGY RESOURCES INC) [Y] 3,13,14 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]JP2004098721 (NAT AEROSPACE LAB) [Y] 24* paragraph [0011] *; | [XAYI]US2012040253 (HERMANN WESTON ARTHUR [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,16,22,23 * paragraphs [0029] - [0047] * * figures 1-17 * [A] 10 [Y] 3,11-14,18,20,24 [I] 5-7,15,17,19,21; | [XAYI]US2014232354 (ALBERTUS PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,16,22,23 * paragraphs [0035] - [0057] * * figure 6 * [A] 2,4-10,18,20 [Y] 3,11-14,24 [I] 15,17,19,21; | [XAYI]US2016164153 (KIM DONG HUI [KR], et al) [X] 1,16,18,20,22,23 * paragraphs [0017] , [ 0037] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0065] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2,4-12 [Y] 3,13,14,18,20,24 [I] 15,17,19,21 | International search | [Y]JPH08510085 (AER ENERGY RESOURCES, INC.) [Y] 3-8, 11-13, 16-18, 20-24 * , page 7, lines 23-27 & US 5356729 A, column 1, lines 33-40 & WO 1994/029924 A1 *; | [Y]JP2004098721 (NAT AEROSPACE LAB) [Y] 22-24* , claims 1, 3, paragraph [0002] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010267476 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 4-8, 11-13, 16- 18, 20-24 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0016], [0038] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011165353 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 8, 11-13, 16- 18, 20-24 * , claim 9, paragraph [0107] & US 2011/0195321 A1, claim 9, paragraph [0114] *; | [Y]JP2013165051 (UNIV TOTTORI, et al) [Y] 21-24 * , claim 6 (Family: none) *; | [XYA]US2016164153 (KIM DONG HUI [KR], et al) [X] 1, 2, 16, 20 * , abstract, paragraph [0062], fig. 1 & DE 102015219919 A1 & KR 10-2016-0067463 A & CN 105680067 A * [Y] 3-8, 11-13, 16, 17, 20-24 [A] 9, 10, 14, 15, 18, 19; | [XY]JP2016517130 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [X] 1, 2, 16, 18, 20, 22 * , claims, fig. 6 & WO 2014/130698 A1, claims, fig. 6 & US 2014/0232354 A1 & CN 105593051 A * [Y] 3-8, 11-13, 16-18, 20-24 | by applicant | WO2015115480 |