EP3653664 - RECORDING PAPER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yupo Corporation 3, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKARASHI Takuya c/o YUPO CORPORATION KASHIMA FACTORY 23 Touwada Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | 02 /
SUGAMATA Yutaro c/o YUPO CORPORATION KASHIMA FACTORY 23 Touwada Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18832743.1 | 28.06.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018JP24579 | Priority number, date | JP20170136039 | 12.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017136039 | JP20170221688 | 17.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017221688 | [2020/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019013005 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3653664 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, B41M5/50, B41M5/52, G03G7/00 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
B41M5/508 (EP);
B41M5/52 (EP);
C08F20/34 (EP);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/044 (EP,US);
G03G7/0046 (EP,US);
G03G7/008 (EP,US);
B41M5/5245 (EP);
B41M5/529 (EP);
C08J2323/02 (EP);
C08J2323/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | C08J7/04, B32B27/00, B32B27/30, B32B27/36, C08F20/34, G03G7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSPAPIER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/21] | English: | RECORDING PAPER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2020/21] | French: | PAPIER D'IMPRESSION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2020 | Translation filed | 10.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 10.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10287039 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-14* abstract *; | [Y]JP2005125515 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2001010202 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [Y] 1-11 * , *; | [Y]JP2001010209 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [Y] 1-11 * , *; | [A]JP2006159770 (OJI PAPER CO) [A] 1-11 * , *; | [Y]JP2008036935 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [Y] 1-11 * , *; | [A]WO2014092142 (YUPO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11* , * | by applicant | JP2002113959 | JP2017136039 | JP2017221688 |