blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3646312

EP3646312 - PHOTOLUMINESCENT COVER FOR INDICATOR SIGNS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.04.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.12.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.04.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gardner, William
8690 Stair Way N.E.
Salem, OR 97305 / US
[2020/19]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2020/19]
Representative(s)Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Straße 11
80636 München / DE
[2022/19]
Former [2020/19]Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date18841676.201.08.2018
[2020/19]
WO2018US44880
Priority number, dateUS20181586698310.01.2018         Original published format: US201815866983
[2020/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019028181
Date:07.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3646312
Date:06.05.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3646312
Date:18.05.2022
Language:EN
[2022/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.02.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:G09F19/22, G09F13/04, G09F13/20, G09F13/06
[2020/22]
CPC:
G09F13/20 (EP); G09F13/06 (EP); G09F2013/05 (EP)
Former IPC [2020/19]G09F19/22, G09F13/04, G09F13/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHOTOLUMINESZIERENDE ABDECKUNG FÜR HINWEISSCHILDER[2020/19]
English:PHOTOLUMINESCENT COVER FOR INDICATOR SIGNS[2020/19]
French:ÉLÉMENT COUVRANT PHOTOLUMINESCENT POUR PANNEAUX INDICATEURS[2020/19]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2020National basic fee paid 
31.01.2020Search fee paid 
31.01.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2020Examination requested  [2020/19]
20.11.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2022Fee for grant paid
06.04.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.04.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)21.02.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.08.2018
CY11.05.2022
MK11.05.2022
AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
IE01.08.2022
LU01.08.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
BE31.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
[2024/23]
Former [2024/20]HU01.08.2018
CY11.05.2022
AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
IE01.08.2022
LU01.08.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
BE31.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2024/18]HU01.08.2018
AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
IE01.08.2022
LU01.08.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
BE31.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/42]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
IE01.08.2022
LU01.08.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
BE31.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/33]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
IE01.08.2022
LU01.08.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/25]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
LU01.08.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/21]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
LU01.08.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/17]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/16]AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/09]AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/07]AT18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/51]AT18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/50]AT18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/49]AT18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/48]AT18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
NO18.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/47]AT18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
NO18.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005198879  (HANNINGTON MICHAEL E [US]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2010263184  (RAY ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1-7 *;
 [X]WO2015198154  (ISOLITE CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0057] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]KR20160001728U  (YOU G M) [A] 1-15* abstract *
International search[A]US2006225326  (ROBINSON MICHAEL G [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , see entire document. *;
 [A]US2010018092  (PECKHAM GEOFFREY M [US]) [A] 1-20 * , see entire document. *;
 [A]US2012102799  (ROBERTS O MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , see entire document. *;
 [A]US2013199064  (O'KELL SEAN PATRICK [GB]) [A] 1-20 * , see entire document. *;
 [A]US2016372014  (LEE ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , see entire document. *
by applicantWO2015198154
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.