EP3664080 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/24] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Mari c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
INATANI, Soichiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18842229.9 | 22.05.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018JP19634 | Priority number, date | JP20170149096 | 01.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017149096 | [2020/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019026395 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3664080 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/00, G10L13/02, G10L13/10 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
G10L13/00 (EP);
G10L15/22 (US);
G06Q30/0252 (US);
G06Q30/0271 (US);
G10L13/02 (EP);
G10L13/10 (EP);
G10L15/08 (US);
G10L25/84 (US);
G10L2015/088 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/24] | G10L13/10, G10L13/00, G10L13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2020/24] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2020/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2020 | Translation filed | 26.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 13.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/17] | 21.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3660838 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-15 * figures 1-4,9 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0032] * * paragraphs [0036] , [0040] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0050] - [0 55] ** paragraphs [0058] - [0100] * | International search | [A]JPH05181491 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-20 * , entire text, all drawings & US 5396577 A *; | [A]JP2003208192 (CANON KK) [A] 1-20 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007128506 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-20* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2014074813 |