EP3668267 - RADIO BASE STATION AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/25] | WIRELESS BASE STATION AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD | ||
[2023/33] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS, SM | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOEDA Teruaki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
UCHINO Tooru c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
UMESH Anil c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18843909.5 | 08.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018JP29743 | Priority number, date | JP20170156204 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017156204 | [2020/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019031541 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668267 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3668267 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/08, H04W92/12, // H04W16/26, H04W24/02 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
H04W88/085 (EP,US);
H04W92/12 (EP,US);
H04W16/26 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04W24/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | H04W92/12, H04W16/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKBASISSTATION UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2023/33] | English: | RADIO BASE STATION AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD | [2023/33] | French: | STATION DE BASE DE RADIO ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/33] |
Former [2020/25] | DRAHTLOSE BASISSTATION UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2020/25] | WIRELESS BASE STATION AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD | ||
Former [2020/25] | STATION DE BASE SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2020 | Translation filed | 13.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 29.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "F1 interface: Radio resource configuration management", vol. TSG RAN, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170506), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-171823, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG3_Iu/TSGR3_96/Docs/, (20170506), XP051265676 [X] 1,5 * 2 Discussion * * Table I (page 2) * * figure 1 * [I] 1-5 | [IA] - CATT, "Consideration on the protocol stack and functions of CU/DU interface", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-170382_CONSIDERATION ON THE PROTOTOL STACK AND FUNCTIONS OF CUDU INTERFACE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHI, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20170212), XP051212974 [I] 1,5 * 2.4 Standardization of NGi interface for both option 2 and option 3-1. * [A] 2-4 | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "Cell management", vol. RAN WG3, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170629, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-172447 CELL MANAGEMENT_DISC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20170626), XP051302388 [A] 1-5 * 2.2 Cell managment function * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "F1AP functions", vol. RAN WG3, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-171637, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20170514), XP051276423 [A] 1-5 * 2 Discussion * | [IP] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "F1 parameter control update", vol. RAN WG3, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171009), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-173879_F1 PARAMETER CONTROL UPDATE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20171009), XP051344301 [IP] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [A] - "F1 interface: Radio resource configuration management", 3GPP TSG RAN WG3 #96 R3- 171823, (20170506), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG3_Iu/TSGR3_96/Docs/R3-171823.zip, XP051265676 [A] 1-5 | [A] - SAMSUNG, KT et al., "F1 interface setup and the deli very of gNB-DU capability", 3GPP TSG RAN WG3 #96 R3-171703, (20170505), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG3_Iu/TSGR3_96/Docs/R3-171703.zip, XP051265407 [A] 1-5 | [A] - "Consideration for NR RAN internal interface for higher layer functional split", 3GPP TSG RAN WG3 #93bis R3-162349, (20160930), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG3_Iu/TSGR3_93bis/Docs/R3-162349.zip, XP051163018 [A] 1-5 |