EP3613147 - SUCCESSIVE APPROXIMATION REGISTER (SAR) ANALOG TO DIGITAL CONVERTER (ADC) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/09] | SUCCESSIVE APPROXIMATION REGISTER (SAR) ANALOG TO DIGITAL CONVERTER (ADC) WITH OVERLAPPING REFERENCE VOLTAGE RANGES | ||
[2021/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Goodix Technology Co., Ltd. Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABOUDINA, Mohamed Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | 02 /
FARID, Ali Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | 03 /
ELWAN, Hassan Osama Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | 04 /
EMIRA, Ahmed Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 18847231.0 | 23.11.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018CN117288 | Priority number, date | US201816029644 | 08.07.2018 Original published format: US201816029644 | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020010779 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3613147 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3613147 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/46, // H03M1/68, H03M1/80 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
H03M1/468 (EP,US);
H03M1/462 (CN,US);
H03M1/466 (US);
H03M1/68 (EP,US);
H03M1/804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALOG-DIGITAL-WANDLER (ADC) MIT SUKZESSIVEM APPROXIMATIONSREGISTER (SAR) | [2021/21] | English: | SUCCESSIVE APPROXIMATION REGISTER (SAR) ANALOG TO DIGITAL CONVERTER (ADC) | [2021/21] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE-NUMÉRIQUE (CAN) À REGISTRE D'APPROXIMATIONS SUCCESSIVES (SAR) | [2021/21] |
Former [2020/09] | ANALOG-DIGITAL-WANDLER (ADC) MIT SUKZESSIVEM APPROXIMATIONSREGISTER (SAR) MIT ÜBERLAPPENDEN REFERENZSPANNUNGSBEREICHEN | ||
Former [2020/09] | SUCCESSIVE APPROXIMATION REGISTER (SAR) ANALOG TO DIGITAL CONVERTER (ADC) WITH OVERLAPPING REFERENCE VOLTAGE RANGES | ||
Former [2020/09] | CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE-NUMÉRIQUE (CAN) À REGISTRE D'APPROXIMATIONS SUCCESSIVES (SAR) À PLAGES DE TENSION DE RÉFÉRENCE SE CHEVAUCHANT | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 19.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2018 | AL | 27.10.2021 | AT | 27.10.2021 | CY | 27.10.2021 | CZ | 27.10.2021 | DK | 27.10.2021 | EE | 27.10.2021 | ES | 27.10.2021 | FI | 27.10.2021 | HR | 27.10.2021 | IT | 27.10.2021 | LT | 27.10.2021 | LV | 27.10.2021 | MC | 27.10.2021 | NL | 27.10.2021 | PL | 27.10.2021 | RO | 27.10.2021 | RS | 27.10.2021 | SE | 27.10.2021 | SI | 27.10.2021 | SK | 27.10.2021 | SM | 27.10.2021 | IE | 23.11.2021 | LU | 23.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | FR | 27.12.2021 | BG | 27.01.2022 | NO | 27.01.2022 | GR | 28.01.2022 | IS | 27.02.2022 | PT | 28.02.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2023/35] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 23.11.2018 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 27.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 27.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 27.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 27.12.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 27.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8581761 (BAHUKHANDI ASHIRWAD [US], et al) [X] 1-14* column 2, line 9 - column 12, line 31; figures 1-9 *; | [X]US2014008515 (WANG RUI [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-6 *; | [X] - MCCREARY J L ET AL, "AII-MOS CHARGE REDISTRIBUTION ANALOG-TO-DIGITAL CONVERSION TECHNIQUES-PART I", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (19751201), vol. SC-10, no. 6, doi:10.1109/JSSC.1975.1050629, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 371 - 379, XP000916718 [X] 1-14 * paragraph [000I] - paragraph [00VI]; figures 1-15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.1975.1050629 | Examination | US2015188561 | WO2019138804 | - OGAWA T ET AL, "SAR ADC algorithm with redundancy", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 2008. APCCAS 2008. IEEE ASIA PACIFIC CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081130), ISBN 978-1-4244-2341-5, pages 268 - 271, XP031404984 | - CHANG ALBERT H ET AL, "A 12b 50MS/s 2.1mW SAR ADC with redundancy and digital background calibration", 2013 PROCEEDINGS OF THE ESSCIRC (ESSCIRC), IEEE, doi:10.1109/ESSCIRC.2013.6649084, ISSN 1930-8833, ISBN 978-1-4799-0643-7, (20130916), pages 109 - 112, (20131028), XP032519023 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ESSCIRC.2013.6649084 | - YOUNGJOO LEE ET AL, "Capacitor array structure and switching control scheme to reduce capacitor mismatch effects for SAR analog-to-digital converters", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS. ISCAS 2010 - 30 MAY-2 JUNE 2010 - PARIS, FRANCE, IEEE, US, (20100530), ISBN 978-1-4244-5308-5, pages 1464 - 1467, XP031724572 |