EP3672034 - COOLING STRUCTURE OF STATOR OF ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meidensha Corporation 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6029 / JP | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAI, Tamotsu c/o MEIDENSHA CORPORATION 1-1 Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6029 / JP | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18848460.4 | 06.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018JP29323 | Priority number, date | JP20170161829 | 25.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017161829 | [2020/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019039243 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672034 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/19, H02K1/20, H02K3/24, // H02K5/173 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
H02K3/24 (EP);
H02K1/20 (US);
H02K9/19 (EP,US);
H02K5/1732 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | H02K9/19, H02K1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | KÜHLSTRUKTUR DES STATORS EINER ELEKTRISCHEN DREHMASCHINE | [2020/26] | English: | COOLING STRUCTURE OF STATOR OF ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE | [2020/26] | French: | STRUCTURE DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE STATOR DE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ROTATIVE | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2020 | Translation filed | 16.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 26.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]FR2260890 (UNELEC [FR]) [I] 1,4,5 * page 2, line 18 - line 21; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH0727270U (.) [A] 1* abstract *; | [YA]US2010045125 (TAKENAKA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0055]; figure - * [A] 1; | [A]US2012235521 (CAI WEI [CN], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]CN102820738 (INST ELECTRICAL ENG CAS) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2013135577 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0026]; figure - * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] *; | [XY]FR3026575 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 23; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2,6 | International search | [A]JPH09154257 (NIPPEI TOYAMA CORP, et al) [A] 1-6 * , *; | [A]JP2010057261 (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1-6 * , US 2010/0052441 A1, 1 - 3 & EP 2159906 A2 *; | [A]JP2011193642 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-6* , *; | [A]JP2014096876 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , US 2014/0125162 A1, 1 - 7 & CN 103812269 A *; | [A]WO2015181889 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * , * | by applicant | JP2007312569 | JP2010057261 | JP2014096876 | JP2015070655 | JP2015211543 |