EP3674360 - POLYOLEFIN RESIN COMPOSITE CONTAINING DISPERSED CELLULOSE FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROISHI, Jirou c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
HARA, Hidekazu c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
SAWADA, Yuka c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 04 /
TAZUKE, Masami c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 05 /
SUZUKI, Toshihiro c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18848639.3 | 23.08.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018JP31251 | Priority number, date | JP20170160680 | 23.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017160680 | [2020/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019039571 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3674360 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/06, C08L23/12, C08L1/02, C08K3/08, G01N3/56 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08K7/02 (US);
C08L1/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/02 (US);
C08L79/06 (US);
G01N3/56 (EP,US);
C08K2003/0812 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/004 (US);
C08L2205/16 (US);
C08L2207/066 (US);
C08L2207/20 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L1/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/06, C08L1/02, C08K3/08 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L1/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L1/02, C08K3/08 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2020/27] | C08L23/06, C08K3/08, C08L1/02, G01N3/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Title | German: | POLYOLEFINHARZVERBUNDSTOFF MIT DISPERGIERTEN CELLULOSEFASERN | [2020/27] | English: | POLYOLEFIN RESIN COMPOSITE CONTAINING DISPERSED CELLULOSE FIBERS | [2020/27] | French: | COMPOSITE DE RÉSINE DE POLYOLÉFINE CONTENANT DES FIBRES DE CELLULOSE DISPERSÉES | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2020 | Translation filed | 26.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 24.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018180469 ; | [A]JP2007260941 ; | [A]EP2682421 (URBANPLAST SIA [LV]) [A] 1-5,8,10,11 * examples 1-3 ** claim - *; | [A]US2014336309 (SAKATA HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,10,12 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0066] * * examples 1-12; table 1 *; | [E]EP3604424 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,2,9-12 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] * * examples 1-9,14; table 1 * * claim - * * paragraph [0025] *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2018, no. 70, Database accession no. 2018-77685X, XP002802538 & WO2018180469 A1 20181004 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,2,9-12 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 75, Database accession no. 2007-801503, XP002802539 & JP2007260941 A 20071011 (HOKUETSU KISHU PAPER CO LTD) [A] 1,2,7,10-12 * abstract * * examples 1-12 * | International search | [A]JPH0673231 (HOKUETSU PAPER MILLS) [A] 1-16 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2011219571 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [X] 1-3, 5-11, 13- 16 * , claims, paragraphs [0016], [0018], examples (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2014015512 (JAPAN POLYETHYLENE CORP, et al) [X] 1-3, 5-11, 13- 16 * , claims, paragraphs [0058], [0071], [0075], examples (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2015209439 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP, et al) [X] 1-3, 5-11, 13- 16 * , claims, paragraphs [0011]-[0023], [0027]-[0030], [0037], [0040], examples (Family: none) *; | [PX]JP2017145393 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [PX] 1-3, 5-7, 9-11, 13-15* , clams, paragraph [0038], examples (Family: none) *; | [PX]WO2018105174 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-16 * , claims, paragraphs [0036], [0074], examples (Family: none) *; | [PX]WO2018105173 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-16 * , claims, paragraph [0073], examples (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH0676644 | JPH07224192 | JP2013161590 | JP2017160680 |