EP3705480 - CLASS OF AMINO-SUBSTITUTED NITROGEN-CONTAINING FUSED RING COMPOUNDS, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Ringene BioPharma Co., Ltd. Room 305, 3rd Floor No.866 Halei Road, China (Shanghai) Pilot Free Trade Zone, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2024/09] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Shanghai Ringene BioPharma Co., Ltd. Room 305, 3rd Floor No.866 Halei Road, China (Shanghai) Pilot Free Trade Zone, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states Rudong Ringene Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd No. 888 Zhujiang Road Juegang Town Rudong County Nantong Jiangsu 226499 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hui No. 888 Zhujiang Road Juegang Town Rudong County Nantong Jiangsu 226499 / CN | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Henderson, Helen Lee Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/09] |
Former [2020/37] | Swan, Elizabeth Mary Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18874000.5 | 30.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018CN112661 | Priority number, date | CN20171139980 | 30.10.2017 Original published format: CN201711039980 | [2020/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019085895 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705480 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3705480 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/14, A61P35/02, A61K31/519, A61P35/00 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07D471/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4375 (KR);
A61K31/444 (KR);
A61K31/4545 (KR);
A61K31/496 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/37] | C07D471/14, A61K31/519, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLASSE VON AMINOSUBSTITUIERTEN STICKSTOFFHALTIGEN KONDENSIERTEN RINGVERBINDUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2020/37] | English: | CLASS OF AMINO-SUBSTITUTED NITROGEN-CONTAINING FUSED RING COMPOUNDS, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND USE THEREOF | [2020/37] | French: | CLASSE DE COMPOSÉS CYCLIQUES CONDENSÉS CONTENANT DE L'AZOTE À SUBSTITUTION AMINO, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2023/48] |
Former [2020/37] | CLASSE DE COMPOSÉS CYCLIQUES FUSIONNÉS CONTENANT DE L'AZOTE À SUBSTITUTION AMINO, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2020 | Translation filed | 12.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 06.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016134294 (INCYTE CORP [US]) [A] 1-13* claims 1-36 *; | [A] - TAO YU ET AL, "A FGFR1 inhibitor patent review: progress since 2010", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, GB, (20161226), doi:10.1080/13543776.2017.1272574, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 1 - 16, XP055339480 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/13543776.2017.1272574 |