EP3723211 - CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-Ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANO Nobuto c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
YAHAGI Keiji c/o Fujikura Ltd. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | 03 /
TSUNOMORI Koji c/o Fujikura Ltd. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 18885254.5 | 12.09.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018JP33732 | Priority number, date | JP20170234572 | 06.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017234572 | [2020/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019111478 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3723211 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52, H01R13/512, H01R13/58 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
H01R13/5208 (EP);
H01R13/512 (EP);
H01R13/516 (EP);
H01R13/5202 (EP);
H01R13/521 (EP);
H01R13/5227 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDER | [2020/42] | English: | CONNECTOR | [2020/42] | French: | CONNECTEUR | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2020 | Translation filed | 29.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 01.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2012252972 (YAZAKI CORP) [X] 1 * , * [Y] 2-7; | [Y]JP2010182471 (YAZAKI CORP, et al) [Y] 2-7 * , *; | [Y]JP2014191958 (YAZAKI CORP) [Y] 3, 5-6 * , *; | [Y]WO2012175573 (FCI AUTOMOTIVE HOLDING [FR], et al) [Y] 5-6 * , *; | [Y]JP2015118744 (FUJIKURA LTD) [Y] 6 * , *; | [Y]JP2012059571 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, et al) [Y] 7 * , * | by applicant | JP2014160611 | JP2013537681 | JP20170234572 |