EP3722098 - INK SUPPLYING DEVICE FOR PRINTER AND INK SUPPLYING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I. Mer Co., Ltd. 112 Joshungamae-cho Shimotoba Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8384 / JP | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IZUME, Masayuki deceased / JP | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 18885703.1 | 14.11.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018JP42075 | Priority number, date | JP20170234770 | 07.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017234770 | [2020/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019111660 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722098 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/14 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
B41F31/26 (EP,US);
B41F31/10 (KR,US);
B41F31/14 (EP,KR,US);
B41F31/30 (KR);
B41F31/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENZUFUHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR DRUCKER UND TINTENZUFUHRVERFAHREN | [2020/42] | English: | INK SUPPLYING DEVICE FOR PRINTER AND INK SUPPLYING METHOD | [2020/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN ENCRE POUR IMPRIMANTE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ALIMENTATION EN ENCRE | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2020 | Translation filed | 28.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 09.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0270825 (AM INT [US]) [A] 1-2* , *; | [Y]JPH09141833 (AIMAA PLANNING KK) [Y] 1-2 * , *; | [Y]JP5588651B [Y] 1-2 * , * | by applicant | JP5588651B |