EP3724063 - FIN STABILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Naiad Maritime Group, Inc. 50 Parrott Drive Shelton, CT 06484 / US | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENABLES, John D. 8 Historic Drive Monroe, Connecticut 06468 / US | 02 /
VENABLES, Steven J. 8 Historic Drive Monroe, Connecticut 06468 / US | 03 /
COSTEN, Cameron 58 Ridge Street Milford, Connecticut 06460 / US | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/12] | LLR 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2020/43] | LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18888233.6 | 17.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018US66022 | Priority number, date | US201715843446 | 15.12.2017 Original published format: US201715843446 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019118972 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724063 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3724063 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B63B39/06 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
B63B39/06 (EP,US);
B63J99/00 (US);
B63B2039/065 (EP,US);
B63B79/00 (US);
F16H49/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLOSSENSTABILISATOR | [2020/43] | English: | FIN STABILIZER | [2020/43] | French: | STABILISATEUR À AILETTES | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 28.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23163194.6 / EP4219285 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | LU | 17.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2172394 (CMC MARINE S R L [IT]) | International search | [A]US2878772 (JOHANNES KJEKSTAD); | [A]US2937608 (WILLIAM VANDERSTEEL); | [A]US3687100 (LARSH EVERETT P); | [A]US2008257245 (STELLA CARL J [US]); | [A]US2010083887 (CAPPIELLO ALESSANDRO [IT]); | [A]US2015096436 (VENABLES JOHN D [US], et al) |