EP3708353 - CARDBOARD BOX DIVIDING DEVICE AND CARDBOARD BOX PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Machinery Systems, Ltd. 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8585 / JP | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAI, Takanori c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES MACHINERY SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8585 / JP | 02 /
SHIGEYAMA, Naoki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES MACHINERY SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8585 / JP | 03 /
OHIRA, Masakazu c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES MACHINERY SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8585 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Yasunari c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES MACHINERY SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8585 / JP | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 18888264.1 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018JP46027 | Priority number, date | WO2017JP45212 | 15.12.2017 Original published format: PCT/JP2017/045212 | [2020/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019117277 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708353 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3708353 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/46, B31B50/20, B26D1/02, B26D1/08, B26D7/01, B26D7/06, B26D7/32 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
B26D1/465 (EP);
B26D7/0675 (EP,US);
B26D7/015 (EP,US);
B31B50/20 (EP,US);
B26D2007/322 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/38] | B31B50/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERTEILUNG EINER KARTONSCHACHTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KARTONSCHACHTEL | [2020/38] | English: | CARDBOARD BOX DIVIDING DEVICE AND CARDBOARD BOX PRODUCTION METHOD | [2020/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIVISION DE BOÎTES EN CARTON ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE BOÎTES EN CARTON | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2020 | Translation filed | 09.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 28.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | LU | 14.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009238662 (DUQUETTE JOHN BRIAN [US]) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0025] , [0 27] * | International search | [A]US3030867 (WRIGHT BENJAMIN H) [A] 1-13* (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH07148697 (KOLBUS GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1-13 * , entire text, all drawings & EP 0641631 A1 & DE 4328682 A1 *; | [XYA]JPH08500297 (MARQUIP, INC.) [X] 1, 6 * , page 11, line 16 to page 21, line 2, fig. 1-8 & US 5375492 A, column 4, line 33 to column 9, line 45, fig. 1-8 & WO 1993/022113 A1 & KR 10-0312265 B1 * [Y] 9-13 [A] 2-5, 7-8; | [A]US5660095 (SMITTERBERG DEAN W [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * , column 1, line 12 to column 2, line 35, column 6, line 48 to column 12, line 45, fig. 1-8 & EP 0712698 A2 *; | [YA]JP2011230441 (ISOWA INDUSTRY CO) [Y] 9-13 * , paragraphs [0087]-[0088], fig. 1-6F & US 2011/0268550 A1 paragraphs [0099]-[0100], fig. 16F * [A] 2-5, 7-8; | [YA]JP2013169690 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND PRINTING) [Y] 13 * , paragraphs [0053]-[0061], fig. 1 & US 2015/0024917 A1, paragraphs [0064]-[0072], fig. 1 & EP 2818312 A1 & CN 104093556 A * [A] 2-5, 7-8; | [A]JP2016132075 (RENGO CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | US5660095 |