EP3734336 - OPTICAL FIBER AND LASER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura, Ltd. 1-5-1, Kiba, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAHARA Rintaro c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
KISHI Tatsuya c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-8550 / JP | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 18893405.3 | 27.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018JP48370 | Priority number, date | JP20170254758 | 28.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017254758 | [2020/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019131970 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734336 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/036, G02B6/02, H01S3/067 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
G02B6/02023 (EP,US);
G02B6/02047 (US);
G02B6/02019 (EP);
G02B6/03616 (US);
H01S3/06733 (EP,US);
H01S3/08045 (EP);
G02B6/03633 (EP);
H01S2301/03 (EP);
H01S3/06704 (EP);
H01S3/0675 (EP);
H01S3/06762 (US);
H01S3/094007 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FASER UND LASERVORRICHTUNG | [2020/45] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER AND LASER DEVICE | [2020/45] | French: | FIBRE OPTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF LASER | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2020 | Translation filed | 23.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 18.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006045450 (BICKHAM SCOTT R [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0060] *; | [A]US2013071114 (BICKHAM SCOTT ROBERTSON [US], et al) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0052] *; | [E]EP3462553 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [E] 1-3,8,9 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0050] * | International search | [Y]JP2010534354 (CORNING INC.) [Y] 4-7 * , paragraphs [0051]-[0053] & US 2010/0195194 A1, paragraphs [0075]-[0077] & WO 2009/014623 A1 & EP 2179312 A1 *; | [A]US2011081123 (PARE CLAUDE [CA], et al) [A] 1-9* , entire text, all drawings & WO 2009/089608 A1 & CA 2712123 A1 *; | [A]WO2013038794 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2013/0336343 A1 *; | [XY]JP6255532B (FUJIKURA LTD.) [X] 1-3, 8-9 * , paragraphs [0025]-[0057], fig. 1, 2 & US 2018/0203186 A1, paragraphs [0029]-[0060], fig. 1, 2 & WO 2018/003184 A1 & EP 3306759 A1 & CN 107851954 A * [Y] 4-7; | [PX]JP2018006596 (FUJIKURA LTD) [PX] 1-3, 8-9 * , entire text, all drawings & WO 2018/008251 A1 * | by applicant | JP2016051859 |