EP3733653 - OXADIAZOLE COMPOUND OR SALTS THEREOF, AGRICULTURAL/HORTICULTURAL FUNGICIDE CONTAINING SAID COMPOUND, AND METHOD FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Nohyaku Co., Ltd. 19-8, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8386 / JP | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA Naoya c/o Research Center, NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD., 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA Masao c/o Research Center, NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD., 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka 586-0094 / JP | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/09] |
Former [2020/45] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18893572.0 | 27.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018JP48107 | Priority number, date | JP20170253308 | 28.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017253308 | JP20180086716 | 27.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018086716 | [2020/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019131867 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3733653 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3733653 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D271/06, A01N43/836, A01P3/00 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP);
A01N43/82 (EP,US);
C07D271/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OXADIAZOLVERBINDUNG ODER SALZE DAVON, LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES/GARTENBAULICHES INSEKTIZID MIT BESAGTER VERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/45] | English: | OXADIAZOLE COMPOUND OR SALTS THEREOF, AGRICULTURAL/HORTICULTURAL FUNGICIDE CONTAINING SAID COMPOUND, AND METHOD FOR USING SAME | [2020/45] | French: | COMPOSÉ D'OXADIAZOLE OU SELS DE CELUI-CI, FONGICIDE AGRICOLE/HORTICOLE CONTENANT LEDIT COMPOSÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉ | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2020 | Translation filed | 24.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 06.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2023 | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | ES | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017076742 (BASF SE [DE]) [A] 1-6* Paragraph II. onwards; page 98; claims 1-19; table I *; | [A]WO2017103223 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * Biological Examples; page 79 - page 81; claims 1-15; tables 1-3 * | International search | [A]WO2016180802 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [A] 1-6* , *; | [A]WO2017055473 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]) [A] 1-6 * , * | by applicant | JPS63162680 | EP0374753 | EP0427529 | EP0451878 | WO9307278 | WO9534656 | WO03052073 | WO2015185485 | WO2017055473 | - "Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 7175 - 7179 | - Weed Science, (20050000), vol. 53, pages 728 - 746 | - GURA T., "Repairing the Genome's Spelling Mistakes", Science, (19990000), vol. 285, pages 316 - 318 |