EP3811816 - BACKPACK WITH INFLATABLE ELEMENT AND FASTENING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martínez Fierro, Jorge Ramón C. Gómez Farías 57 C 2 Col. Del Carmen, Ciudad de México 04100 / MX | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Anidjar Mogeda, Miriam Arochi & Lindner S.L. Calle Gurtubay 6 - Piso 3º Izda. 28001 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | Padial Martinez, Ana Belen Arochi & Lindner C/ Gurtubay Nº 6-3º Izquierda 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 18924733.1 | 25.06.2018 | [2021/17] | WO2018MX00058 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020005050 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | ES | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3811816 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A45F3/14, A45F3/04, A47D13/02 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A45F4/02 (EP,US);
A45F3/00 (US);
A45F3/04 (EP);
A47C16/00 (EP);
A47C7/383 (EP);
A47D13/025 (EP,US);
A45C13/021 (EP);
A45F2003/003 (US);
A45F2003/045 (US);
A45F2004/026 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | RUCKSACK MIT AUFBLASBAREM ELEMENT UND BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENTEN | [2021/17] | English: | BACKPACK WITH INFLATABLE ELEMENT AND FASTENING ELEMENTS | [2021/17] | French: | SAC À DOS À ÉLÉMENT GONFLABLE ET ÉLÉMENTS DE FIXATION | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2021 | Translation filed | 21.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4484700 (BUSH SYDNEY J [GB]) [A] 4 * ; figura 1 , columna 3 lineas 64-67 *; | [A]US4842173 (SCHERER MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 12* ; figura 1 *; | [Y]US2005205634 (HAN SANG H [KR]) [Y] 2 * ; figura 3, parrafo [0018] *; | [A]US2008149677 (HOWELL FRANK A [US]) [A] 12 * ; figuras 3, 8 *; | [A]US2008296328 (WU TSUNG-YUAN [TW]) [A] 7 * ; figura 1 *; | [YA]US2015335171 (TAGLE REINOLD [US]) [Y] 1-3, 5-6, 8-11 * ; figuras 20 y 21 , parrafo [0114] * [A] 4; | [YA]US2016016043 (ROSE GORDON T [CA], et al) [Y] 1-3, 5-6, 8-11 * ; figuras 3, 4, 7, 10,12A, 12B, 13, parrafos 0034, [0053] * [A] 4, 7, 10-11, 12; | [A]US2016015094 (WALKER JOSEPH BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 7 * ; figura 14D *; | [Y] - Soybu, "Soybu Womens Moksha Convertible Bag", (20160000), pages 1 - 3, Amazon, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20160330024401/https://www.amazon.com/Soybu-Womens-Moksha-Convertible-Bag/dp/B011E5WBJM, (20181011), XP009525203 [Y] 1-3, 5-6, 8-11 * . * | [Y] - Jon, "Osprey Rev 1.5 Trail Running Pack Review", (20151130), Outdoors Magic, URL: https://outdoorsmagic.com/reviews/osprey-rev-1-5-trail-running-pack-review, (20181011), XP009525204 [Y] 1-3, 5-6, 8-11 * . * | by applicant | US5645319 | US2004064893 | CN203841279U | US8984688 | CN105640182 | US2016331161 | WO2016US45404 |