EP3875216 - TOOL CONVEYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makino Milling Machine Co., Ltd. 3-19 Nakane 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8578 / JP | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANO, Yuji c/o MAKINO MILLING MACHINE CO., LTD., 3560-1, Katsuyama, Fujikawaguchiko-machi Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0310 / JP | 02 /
KATSUMATA, Kenji c/o MAKINO MILLING MACHINE CO., LTD., 3560-1, Katsuyama, Fujikawaguchiko-machi Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0310 / JP | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | McWilliams, David John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/36] | McWilliams, David John Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18938436.5 | 31.10.2018 | [2021/36] | WO2018JP40592 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020090052 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875216 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q3/157, B23Q3/155 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
B23Q3/15722 (EP);
B23Q3/15773 (US);
B23Q3/15553 (US);
B23Q3/1572 (US);
B23Q3/15746 (EP);
B23Q2003/15532 (US);
B23Q2003/155404 (US);
B23Q2003/155418 (EP);
Y10S483/902 (US);
Y10T483/176 (US);
Y10T483/1776 (US);
Y10T483/1864 (US);
Y10T483/1882 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | B23Q3/157 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGFÖRDERER | [2021/36] | English: | TOOL CONVEYING DEVICE | [2021/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT D'OUTIL | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2021 | Translation filed | 23.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 30.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5554087 (HWANG YAW-DER [TW], et al) [A] 1 * figures 9-14; claim 9 *; | [A]JPH09300157 (MAKINO MILLING MACHINE) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0023] - [0024]; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US2004029691 (MAEDA MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1* figures 1-2; claim 1 * | International search | [A]JPS62193739 (HITACHI SEIKI KK) [A] 1-2 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH09192966 (HITACHI SEIKI KK) [A] 1-2 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2003094273 (MAKINO MILLING MACHINE) [A] 1-2 * & US 2004/0029691 A1 & WO 2003/026839 A1 & EP 1439027 A1 *; | [A]US7604584 (WU CHI-CHUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-2* (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH09300157 |