EP3880767 - SOLVENTLESS ADHESIVE COMPOSITION PROCESS AND LAMINATE WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAI, Chenyan No. 936 Zhangheng Road, Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
HABLOT, Elodie Bachtobelstrasse 3 8810 Horgen / CH | 03 /
CHEN, Gaobing No. 936 Zhangheng Road, Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
SCHMIDT, Thorsten Bachtobelstrasse 3 8810 Horgen / CH | 05 /
BARRETTO, Abraham Dow India Technology Center Raheja District Jui Nagar 400705 / IN | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 18940384.3 | 16.11.2018 | [2021/38] | WO2018CN115824 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020097900 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880767 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09J175/06, C09J175/08, C09J175/00 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
C09J175/04 (EP);
C09J175/14 (US);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/12 (EP);
C08G18/3206 (US);
C08G18/4009 (EP);
C08G18/4063 (US);
C08G18/4238 (US);
C08G18/4829 (US);
C08G18/627 (US);
C08G18/6644 (EP);
C08G18/6677 (EP,US);
C08G18/722 (US);
C08G18/724 (EP);
C08G18/728 (US);
C08G18/73 (US);
C08G18/7671 (EP,US);
C08G18/792 (EP);
C09D175/04 (EP);
C09J175/06 (EP);
C09J175/08 (EP);
C09J5/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/6644 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | PROZESS FÜR LÖSUNGSMITTELFREIE KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND LAMINAT DAMIT | [2021/38] | English: | SOLVENTLESS ADHESIVE COMPOSITION PROCESS AND LAMINATE WITH SAME | [2021/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE SANS SOLVANT ET STRATIFIÉ LA COMPRENANT | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 19.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1234842 (MITSUI TAKEDA CHEMICALS INC [JP]); | [X]CN107118734 (SELEN COMPOSITE MATERIAL SCIENCE & TECH (CHANGZHOU) CO LTD); | [X]CN108659775 (GUANGDONG SINO ADHESIVE NEW MATERIAL TECH CO LTD) |