EP3873084 - METHOD FOR PHOTOGRAPHING LONG-EXPOSURE IMAGE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/41] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONG, Jiyang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/40] |
Former [2021/35] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18942323.9 | 06.12.2018 | [2021/35] | WO2018CN119634 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020113534 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3873084 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3873084 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N23/611, H04N23/63, H04N23/72, H04N23/741, H04N23/667 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
H04N5/272 (EP,US);
H04N23/73 (US);
G06T5/50 (US);
H04N23/611 (EP);
H04N23/631 (EP);
H04N23/667 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | H04N5/232, H04N5/262, H04N5/235, H04N5/272 | ||
Former IPC [2021/35] | H04N5/232, H04N5/262 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FOTOGRAFIEREN EINES BILDES MIT LANGER BELICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/35] | English: | METHOD FOR PHOTOGRAPHING LONG-EXPOSURE IMAGE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2021/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PHOTOGRAPHIE D'IMAGE À LONGUE EXPOSITION ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2021 | Translation filed | 25.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017085808 (JIANG JUNMIN [CN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0111]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2017257561 (WEI QIANG [CN], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,8-10,13,15 * paragraph [0115]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP3226537 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 4,5,7,11,12,14* paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0116]; figure 3 * |