EP3893540 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING CONFIGURATION PARAMETERS, AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Shukun No.18 Haibin Road, Wusha,Chang an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Jianhua No.18 Haibin Road, Wusha,Chang an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 18942975.6 | 14.12.2018 | [2021/41] | WO2018CN121308 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020118718 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3893540 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04W76/28 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
H04W76/27 (EP,CN);
H04W24/02 (EP,CN);
H04W76/28 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/30 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON KONFIGURATIONSPARAMETERN UND ENDGERÄT | [2021/41] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING CONFIGURATION PARAMETERS, AND TERMINAL | [2021/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA DÉTERMINATION DE PARAMÈTRES DE CONFIGURATION, ET TERMINAL | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2021 | Translation filed | 08.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 14.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.12.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - INTERDIGITAL INC, "Update and conclusion on solution 38: eDRX in RRC inactive", vol. SA WG2, no. Dongguan, China; 20181015 - 20181019, (20181009), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-1810771_CIOT_UPDATE AND CONCLUSION ON SOLUTION 38, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANC, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F129%5FDongguan/Docs/S2%2D1810771%2Ezip, (20181009), XP051539720 [X] 1-7,9,10,12-15 * paragraph [6.38.2] * [A] 8,11 | [T] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (Release 15)", (20181001), 3GPP DRAFT; 36331-F30, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/Specifications/201809%5Ffinal%5Fspecs%5Fafter%5FRAN%5F81/36331%2Df30%2Ezip, (20181001), XP051519475 [T] 2-4 * paragraph [5.3.8] * * paragraph [6.2.2] * | [T] - ANONYMOUS, "3 Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); User Equipment (UE) procedures in idle mode (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 36.304, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180930), no. V15.1.0, pages 1 - 55, XP051487410 [T] 2-4 * paragraph [07.1] - paragraph [07.3] * | [T] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; NR and NG-RAN Overall Description; Stage 2 (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 38.300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20181007), vol. RAN WG2, no. V15.3.1, pages 1 - 92, XP051487627 [T] 2-4 * paragraph [9.2.5] * | [T] - ANONYMOUS, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; System Architecture for the 5G System; Stage 2 (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 23.501, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180917), no. V15.3.0, pages 1 - 226, XP051487016 [T] 5-7 * paragraph [5.3.3.2.5] * | [A] - ERICSSON, "eDRX with RRC Inactive - solution update and evaluation", vol. SA WG2, no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20180820 - 20180824, (20180827), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-188994_WAS8881_CIOT_EDRX WITH RRC INACTIVE - SOLUTION UPDATE AND EVALUATION_V4, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 S, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F128BIS%5FSophia%5FAntipolis/Docs/S2%2D188994%2Ezip, (20180827), XP051503101 [A] 1-15 * page 2 * |