EP3666700 - DEVICE FOR WINDING AND WINDING REPLACEMENT FOR WEB-SHAPED MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOSOKAWA ALPINE Aktiengesellschaft Peter-Dörfler-Strasse 13-25 86199 Augsburg / DE | For all designated states Hosokawa Kolb GmbH Spicher Strasse 40-42 53859 Niederkassel / DE | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTPHAL, Sebastian Prinz-Albert-Straße 91 53113 Bonn / DE | 02 /
DURNER, Klaus Donauwörther Straße 41a 86343 Köningsbrunn / DE | 03 /
GÖLLNER Manfred Adolf Kolping Straße 86399 Bodingen / DE | 04 /
HOYER, Nicole Loßkittel 1 53804 Much / DE | 05 /
KAMMER, Jens Christian An der Wielermaar 153 51143 Köln / DE | 06 /
KLIMEK, Lothar Lechallee 53a 86399 Bobingen / DE | [2020/49] |
Former [2020/25] | 01 /
Westphal, Sebastian Prinz-Albert-Straße 91 53113 Bonn / DE | Representative(s) | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 19000556.1 | 11.12.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | DE20181009632 | 11.12.2018 Original published format: DE102018009632 | [2020/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666700 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3666700 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/22 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
B65H19/223 (EP);
B65H19/30 (CN,KR);
B65H19/26 (US);
B65H18/00 (RU);
B65H18/10 (US);
B65H19/22 (RU);
B65H19/2207 (KR);
B65H35/02 (KR);
B65H2301/413523 (EP);
B65H2301/418 (KR);
B65H2301/5155 (KR);
B65H2403/942 (EP);
B65H2701/1752 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFWICKELN UND WICKELWECHSEL VON BAHNFÖRMIGEM MATERIAL UND EIN VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR WINDING AND WINDING REPLACEMENT FOR WEB-SHAPED MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR SAME | [2020/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENROULEMENT ET DE CHANGEMENT DE BOBINE DE MATÉRIAU EN FORME DE BANDE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 17.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor | 15.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2021 | Decision despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2019 | AL | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | NL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IE | 11.12.2021 | LU | 11.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IE | 11.12.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IE | 11.12.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | EE | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | EE | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE4428249 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) [AD] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19755357 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10035894 (FUJI IRON WORKS [JP]) [A] 1,6* figure -; claim - *; | [XAI]EP2261152 (FUJI IRON WORKS [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,13,14 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038]; figure - * [A] 3,6,10-12 [I] 4 | by applicant | DE4428249 |