EP3508422 - TRAY MOUNTED LONGITUDINAL GUIDE WITH CONVEYANCE IN THE LOWERED POSITION AND VERTICAL RESTRAINT IN THE RAISED POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2021/13] |
Former [2019/28] | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfau, Ryan 807 8th Avenue SE Rp Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | 02 /
Larson, Wallace Harold 3327 Hwy 20 SE Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | 03 /
Olson, Mark L. 3031 83 1/2 Ave SE Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | 04 /
Schafer, Ryan 1526 6th Avenue NE Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | 05 /
Uden, Andrew Ray 606 - 6th Avenue SE Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | 06 /
Landis, Brian 1510 11th Ave. NE Apt. 12 Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | [2021/13] |
Former [2019/28] | 01 /
PFAU, Ryan 807 8th Avenue SE Rp Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | ||
02 /
LARSON, Wallace Harold 3327 Hwy 20 SE Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | |||
03 /
OLSON, Mark L. 3031 83 1/2 Ave SE Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | |||
04 /
SCHAFER, Ryan 1526 6th Avenue NE Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | |||
05 /
UDEN, Andrew Ray 606 - 6th Avenue SE Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | |||
06 /
LANDIS, Brian 1510 11th Ave. NE Apt. 12 Jamestown, ND 58401 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/13] |
Former [2019/28] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19150916.5 | 09.01.2019 | [2019/28] | Priority number, date | US201815866241 | 09.01.2018 Original published format: US201815866241 | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508422 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3508422 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B64D9/00, B60P7/08, B63B25/22 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
B64D9/003 (EP,US);
B60P7/13 (US);
B65G13/12 (US);
B64D2009/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2019/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TABLETTMONTIERTE LÄNGSFÜHRUNG MIT FÖRDERUNG IN ABGESENKTER POSITION UND VERTIKALER SICHERUNG IN ANGEHOBENER POSITION | [2019/28] | English: | TRAY MOUNTED LONGITUDINAL GUIDE WITH CONVEYANCE IN THE LOWERED POSITION AND VERTICAL RESTRAINT IN THE RAISED POSITION | [2019/28] | French: | GUIDE LONGITUDINAL MONTÉ SUR UN PLATEAU À TRANSPORT EN POSITION ABAISSÉE ET RETENUE VERTICALE EN POSITION RELEVÉE | [2019/28] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 12.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2019 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | ES | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | IT | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | NL | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 09.01.2019 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US3377040 (HANSEN RICHARD J) [X] 9,14 * figure - * [A] 1-8 [I] 10-13,15; | [XAI]US3986460 (VOIGT WERNER, et al) [X] 9,14 * abstract * [A] 1-8 [I] 10-13,15; | [XI]AU6712381 (KLAAS VISSER) [X] 1,2,6,14 * figures 4-5 * [I] 7-9; | [XAI]EP0881144 (TELAIR INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 9,14 * abstract * [A] 1-8[I] 10-13,15; | [X]US2008310944 (STEGMILLER SCOTT G [US]) [X] 1,14 * abstract *; | [XAI]DE102010035099 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]) [X] 9,14 * figures 4a,4b,5a,5b * [A] 1-8 [I] 10-13,15 |