EP3553456 - HOLSTER MOUNT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safariland, LLC 13386 International Parkway Jacksonville, FL 32218 / US | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROGERS, William H. 3315 Kindred Spirit Lane St. Augustine, FL 32092 / US | 02 /
McKENDRICK, Matthew E. 13064 Christine Marie Ct. Jacksonville, FL 32225 / US | 03 /
VACCARO, Dylan 11707 Donato Drive Jacksonville, FL 32226 / US | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2019/42] | Application number, filing date | 19151040.3 | 09.01.2019 | [2019/42] | Priority number, date | US201815950731 | 11.04.2018 Original published format: US201815950731 | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3553456 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3553456 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F41C33/04 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
F41C33/045 (EP);
F41C33/041 (EP);
F41C33/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2019/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HALFTERTRÄGER | [2019/42] | English: | HOLSTER MOUNT | [2019/42] | French: | MONTAGE D'ÉTUI | [2019/42] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 06.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2019 | AL | 19.05.2021 | AT | 19.05.2021 | CY | 19.05.2021 | DK | 19.05.2021 | EE | 19.05.2021 | FI | 19.05.2021 | HR | 19.05.2021 | LT | 19.05.2021 | LV | 19.05.2021 | MC | 19.05.2021 | MK | 19.05.2021 | NL | 19.05.2021 | PL | 19.05.2021 | RO | 19.05.2021 | RS | 19.05.2021 | SE | 19.05.2021 | SI | 19.05.2021 | SK | 19.05.2021 | SM | 19.05.2021 | BG | 19.08.2021 | NO | 19.08.2021 | GR | 20.08.2021 | IS | 19.09.2021 | PT | 20.09.2021 | IE | 09.01.2022 | LU | 09.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
MK | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 09.01.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 09.01.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IE | 09.01.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
LU | 09.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
LU | 09.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
LU | 09.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5419472 (HELLWEG ALBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 3 - line 55 * * figure - *; | [A]JPH09229596 (SANSHU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP1479998 (RADAR LEATHER DIVISION S R L [IT]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0020] * * figure - * * up, down, size and rotation *; | [A]US7866515 (BUIS III CHARLES E [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 9, line 30 - column 10, line 15 * * figure - * * 4 vertical drop positions. *; | [A]WO2011141453 (KRAFT JOSEF [AT]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2 - page 3 * * page 5 ** figure - *; | [A]US2013181018 (KENDRICK KARL [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] * * figure - * * standard Safariland IPSC race holster. *; | [A]US2015097011 (CLIFTON JR NORMAN E [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * * figure - * |