Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536146

EP3536146 - HYBRID SEED POTATO BREEDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agventure B.V.
Delhorstpad 1A
6703 BE Wageningen / NL
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Lindhout, Willem Hendrik
Delhorstpad 1A
6703 BE Wageningen / NL
02 / Schotte, Teunis Philippus
Westzijdeweg 33A
2391 JE Hazerswoude-Dorp / NL
03 / Visser, Richard Gerardus Franciscus
Emmalaan 17
6721 ET Bennekom / NL
04 / van Eck, Herman Johannes
Eykmanstraat 9
6706 JT Wageningen / NL
05 / Hutten, Ronaldus Cornelis Bernardus
De Thijmenstoren 12
3912 AT Rhenen / NL
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
Carnegieplein 5
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date19152162.426.10.2010
[2019/37]
Priority number, dateUS200925498009P26.10.2009         Original published format: US 25498009 P
EP2009001347426.10.2009         Original published format: EP 09013474
[2019/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536146
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2019
ClassificationInternational:A01H1/02, A01H5/04, A01H6/82
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
TitleGerman:KARTOFFELZÜCHTUNG MIT HYBDRIDSAAT[2019/37]
English:HYBRID SEED POTATO BREEDING[2019/37]
French:PRODUCTION DE SEMENCES DE POMME DE TERRE HYBRIDES[2019/37]
Examination procedure16.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10770643.4  / EP2493286
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
19.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201910   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0913081  (PRESIDENT OF KOBE UNIVERSITY A [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 6 *;
 [Y]  - MARIS B, "COMPARISON OF DIPLOID AND TETRAPLOID POTATO FAMILIES DERIVED FROM SOLANUM-PHUREJA X DIHAPLOID SOLANUM-TUBEROSUM HYBRIDS AND THEIR VEGETATIVELY DOUBLED COUNTERPARTS", EUPHYTICA, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NL, (199003), vol. 46, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1007/BF00057615, ISSN 0014-2336, pages 15 - 33, XP008132658 [Y] 1-15 * table 8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00057615
 [A]  - SHELLEY HERMUNDSTAD ET AL, "Tuber yield and tuber traits of haploid-wild species F1 hybrids", POTATO RESEARCH, ASSOCIATION FOR POTATO RESEARCH, WAGENINGEN, NL, (198609), vol. 29, doi:DOI:10.1007/BF02359958, ISSN 0014-3065, pages 289 - 297, XP008132723 [A] 1-15 * page 290; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02359958
 [Y]  - WATANABE K N ET AL, "Generation of pest resistant, diploid potato germplasm with short-day adaptation from diverse genetic stocks", BREEDING SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 329 - 336, XP002577156 [Y] 1-15 * tables 1,2,8 *
 [A]  - WANG D ET AL, "Improving main agronomic characters of dihaploids with 2n gametes by means of sexual hybridisation and anther culture of potato (Solanum tuberosum)", NEW ZEALAND JOURNAL OF CROP AND HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, (200003), vol. 28, no. 1, ISSN 0114-0671, pages 1 - 8, XP002626196 [A] 1-15 * table 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/01140671.2000.9514116
 [Y]  - PHUMICHAI CHALERMPOL ET AL, "Toward the development of highly homozygous diploid potato lines using the self-compatibility controlling Sli gene", GENOME, (200512), vol. 48, no. 6, ISSN 0831-2796, pages 977 - 984, XP002577501 [Y] 1-15 * figure 1; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/G05-066
 [A]  - BANI-AAMEUR F ET AL, "Enhancement of diploid Solanum chacoense Bitt. using adapted clones of Solanum phureja Juz. and Buk", EUPHYTICA, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NL, (199301), vol. 68, no. 3, doi:DOI:10.1007/BF00029870, ISSN 0014-2336, pages 169 - 179, XP008132638 [A] 1-15 * figure 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00029870
 [A]  - BUSO J A ET AL, "Tuber yield and quality of 4x-2x (FDR) potato progenies derived from the wild diploid species Solanum berthaultii and Solanum tarijense.", PLANT BREEDING, (200306), vol. 122, no. 3, ISSN 0179-9541, pages 229 - 232, XP002626126 [A] 1-15 * table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1439-0523.2003.00815.x
 [A]  - VISKER M H P W ET AL, "Correlation between late blight resistance and foliage maturity type in potato", EUPHYTICA, (200406), vol. 137, no. 3, ISSN 0014-2336, pages 311 - 323, XP002577157 [A] 1-15 * tables 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:EUPH.0000040451.21852.d8
 [A]  - DINU I I ET AL, "Novel inter-series hybrids in Solanum, section Petota", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS ; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PLANT BREEDING RESEARCH, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S00122-004-1782-X, (20041029), vol. 110, no. 3, ISSN 1432-2242, pages 403 - 415, XP019321811 [A] 1-15 * page 409, column 410; table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-004-1782-x
 [A]  - JUAN PABLO RAIMONDI ET AL, "Crossability relationships among the wild diploid potato species Solanum kurtzianum, S. chacoense and S. ruiz-lealii from Argentina.", EUPHYTICA, (2003), vol. 132, no. 3, ISSN 0014-2336, pages 287 - 295, XP002577155 [A] 1-15 * tables 1,2,3 *
 [A]  - EIJLANDER R ET AL, "Selection of vigorous and fertile S-homo- and heterozygous tester clones from self-incompatible diploid potato, Solanum tuberosum L", EUPHYTICA, (1997), vol. 97, no. 1, ISSN 0014-2336, pages 97 - 111, XP002577160 [A] 1-15 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1003041006157
 [A]  - HOSAKA KAZUYOSHI ET AL, "Genetics of self-compatibility in a self-incompatible wild diploid potato species Solanum chacoense. 1. Detection of an S locus inhibitor (Sli) gene", EUPHYTICA, (1998), vol. 99, no. 3, ISSN 0014-2336, pages 191 - 197, XP002577158 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HERMSEN J G T ET AL, "INHERITANCE OF GENETIC MARKERS FROM 2 POTATO DI HA PLOIDS AND THEIR RESPECTIVE PARENT CULTIVARS", EUPHYTICA, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NL, (197810), vol. 27, no. 3, ISSN 0014-2336, pages 681 - 688, XP008131098 [A] 1-15 * page 681 - page 682; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00023703
 [A]  - DE MAINE M J, "The effects of inbreeding on the parental values of potato dihaploids", ANNALS OF APPLIED BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 127, no. 1, ISSN 0003-4746, pages 151 - 156, XP002626197 [A] 1-15 * tables 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1744-7348.1995.tb06659.x
 [A]  - JANSKY S, "Overcoming hybridization barriers in potato", PLANT BREEDING, (200602), vol. 125, no. 1, ISSN 0179-9541, pages 1 - 12, XP002626127 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1439-0523.2006.01178.x
 [A]  - SIMMONDS N W, "A review of potato propagation by means of seed, as distinct from clonal propagation by tubers", POTATO RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 40, ISSN 0014-3065, pages 191 - 214, XP002575879 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02358245
 [T]  - PIM LINDHOUT ET AL, "Towards F1 Hybrid Seed Potato Breeding", POTATO RESEARCH ; JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION FOR POTATORESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20111215), vol. 54, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S11540-011-9196-Z, ISSN 1871-4528, pages 301 - 312, XP019993810 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11540-011-9196-z
by applicant   - UIJTEWAAL et al., Euphytica, (19870000), vol. 36, pages 745 - 753
    - UMAERUS, Proceeding of the 10th Triennial Conference of the European Association of Potato Research, (19870000), pages 72 - 103
    - ALMEKINDERS et al., Potato Research, (20090000), vol. 52, pages 275 - 293
    - BIRHMAN; HOSAKA, Genome, (20000000), vol. 43, pages 495 - 502
    - "Genetic modification of Plants", ROMMENS, Biotechnology in Agriculture and Forestry, (20100000), vol. 64, pages 61 - 77
    - DOUCHES et al., Crop Science, (19990000), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 1544 - 1552
    - HOSAKA; HANNEMAN, Euphytica, (19980000), vol. 99, pages 191 - 197
    - DR. IR RONALD B.C. HUTTEN, Laboratory of Plant Breeding (IVP
    - HERMSEN, J.G.TH., Euphytica, (19780000), vol. 27, pages 1 - 11
    - UIJTEWAAL et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19870000), vol. 73, pages 751 - 78
    - JACOBSEN; SOPORY, Theor. Appl. Genet., (19770000), vol. 52, pages 119 - 123
    - PHUMICHAI; HOSAKA, Euphytica, (20060000), vol. 149, pages 251 - 258
    - VAN OS et al., Genetics, (20060000), vol. 173, no. 2, pages 1075 - 1087
    - DR. IR RONALD B.C. HUTTEN, Laboratory of Plant Breeding
    - BARANDALLA et al., Potato Research, (20060000), vol. 49, pages 143 - 154
    - PHUMICHAI et al., Euphytica, (20060000), vol. 148, pages 227 - 234
    - Euphytica, (19980000), vol. 99, pages 191 - 197
    - Genome, (20050000), vol. 48, pages 977 - 984
    - SHEN et al., Mutation Research, (20050000), vol. 573, pages 70 - 82
    - ANITHAKUMARI et al., Mol. Breeding, (20100000), vol. 26, pages 65 - 75
    - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - VOORRIPS et al., "Potato Breeding after completion of the DNA Sequence of the Potato Genome", EAPR-EUCARPIA congress, (20100627), page 42, URL: http://edepot.wur.nl/143559
    - VAN OS et al., Genetics, (20060000), vol. 173, pages 1075 - 1087
    - PHUMICHAI et al., Genome, (20050000), vol. 48, pages 977 - 984