EP3575607 - ELECTRIC WATER PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strong Way Industrial Co., Ltd. No. 8-6, Wanjin Road Dashe District Kaohsiung City 81545 / TW | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Shui-Ta No. 8-6, Wanjin Road Dashe District 81545 Kaohsiung City / TW | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Hübner, Gerd Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 19152262.2 | 17.01.2019 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | TW20210718922 | 01.06.2018 Original published format: TW 10718922 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3575607 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/06, F04D29/58, F04D29/42, H02K5/20 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
F04D13/0606 (EP);
F04D29/5806 (EP,US);
F04D13/06 (US);
F04D29/426 (EP);
F04D29/5813 (EP,US);
F04D29/586 (US);
H02K5/203 (EP,US);
H02K7/14 (EP);
H02K9/19 (EP,US);
F04D1/00 (EP);
F04D7/02 (US);
F05B2210/11 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE WASSERPUMPE | [2019/49] | English: | ELECTRIC WATER PUMP | [2019/49] | French: | POMPE À EAU ÉLECTRIQUE | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012024778 (MAGNA POWERTRAIN USA INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0025] - [0037]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2013302142 (CHIU ARTHUR [TW], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0040] - [0041]; figure 9 *; | [X]EP3073119 (HANGZHOU SANHUA RES INST CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0010] - [0024]; figures 2,5-9 *; | [A]US2017268523 (ZANOTTO FILHO PLINIO LUIZ [BR]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0029] - [0040]; figures 1-6 * |