EP3527918 - FOODSTUFF SENSING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abdoo, Joshua George Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) Italy) 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta / IT | 02 /
Bruno, Ariana M. Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) Italy) 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta / IT | 03 /
Chase, Kevin M. Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) Italy) 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta / IT | 04 /
Dudhe, Rahul Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) Italy) 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta / IT | 05 /
Giacomini, Neomar Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) Italy) 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta / IT | 06 /
Nagarajan, Aravind Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) Italy) 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta / IT | 07 /
Pirovano, Maria Paola Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) Italy) 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta / IT | 08 /
Sells, Joel Matthew Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) Italy) 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta / IT | 09 /
Showers, Aaron Edward Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) Italy) 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta / IT | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Spina, Alessandro Whirlpool Management EMEA S.R.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Spina, Alessandro Whirlpool EMEA SpA Via Carlo Pisacane, 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 19156290.9 | 08.02.2019 | [2019/34] | Priority number, date | US201815896477 | 14.02.2018 Original published format: US201815896477 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3527918 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3527918 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F25D29/00, G01N21/00, F24C7/00, G01N21/25, G01N33/02, // G01N3/00 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
F25D29/00 (EP);
F24C15/008 (EP);
F24C7/087 (EP);
G01N21/3504 (EP);
G01N21/3563 (EP);
F24C15/102 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHRUNGSMITTELERFASSUNGSGERÄT | [2019/34] | English: | FOODSTUFF SENSING APPLIANCE | [2019/34] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION D'ALIMENTS | [2019/34] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2013010294 (MATSUDA KYOKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0046] , [0087] , [0088] , [0058]; figures 6,7 * [A] 5-11; | [X]JP2016011986 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0044] , [0 51] , [0 73] - [0077] - [0 86] - [0089] - [0 91] , [0096] - [0100]; figures 11,12,1,14 *; | [A]EP3128274 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1-11* the whole document * |