EP3546368 - INLET DIFFUSER FOR JET ENGINE AND METHOD FOR DIFFUSING INCOMING AIR OF JET ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUYNH, Thuy The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Paza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2020/32] |
Former [2019/40] | 01 /
HUYNH, Thuy The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Paza CHICAGO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/32] |
Former [2019/40] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19156786.6 | 12.02.2019 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | US201815924031 | 16.03.2018 Original published format: US201815924031 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3546368 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3546368 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B64D33/02, F02C7/04 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
B64D33/02 (EP,US);
F02C7/042 (US);
B64D27/16 (CN);
F02C7/04 (EP,CN,US);
F04D29/541 (CN);
B64D2033/0226 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] |
Former [2019/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINLASSDIFFUSOR FÜR STRAHLTRIEBWERK UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIFFUSION VON EINTRETENDER LUFT VOM STRAHLTRIEBWERK | [2019/40] | English: | INLET DIFFUSER FOR JET ENGINE AND METHOD FOR DIFFUSING INCOMING AIR OF JET ENGINE | [2019/40] | French: | DIFFUSEUR D'ENTRÉE POUR MOTEUR À RÉACTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DIFFUSION D'AIR ENTRANT DE MOTEUR À RÉACTION | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 05.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2019 | AL | 05.08.2020 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | NL | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | IE | 12.02.2021 | LU | 12.02.2021 | ES | 13.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 12.02.2021 | ||
LU | 12.02.2021 | ||
ES | 13.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 12.02.2021 | ||
LU | 12.02.2021 | ||
ES | 13.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 12.02.2021 | ||
LU | 12.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 12.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2477637 (ERNEST MERCIER PIERRE) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,12,14 * column 4, line 11 - column 13, line 30; figure - * [A] 10,13[I] 6,7,15; | [XAI]US2772620 (ANTONIO FERRI) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,12,14 * the whole document * [A] 10,13 [I] 6,7,15; | [XAI]US4058141 (HASINGER SIEGFRIED H, et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,12,14 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 33; figure - * [A] 10,13 [I] 6,7,15; | [XAI]US5937908 (INOSHIRI RYO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,12,14 * column 3, line 55 - column 9, line 65; figure - * [A] 10,13 [I] 6,7,15 |