EP3504989 - VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/27] | VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS AND METHODS | ||
[2021/04] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2025 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juul Labs International Inc. 1000 F Street NW Washington DC 20004 / US | [2024/39] |
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states Juul Labs International Inc. 560 20th Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | ||
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Juul Labs UK Holdco Limited Suite 1, 3rd Floor 11 - 12 St. James's Square London SW1Y 4LB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monsees, James 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 02 /
Bowen, Adam 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 03 /
Hatton, Cole 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 04 /
Christensen, Steven 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 05 /
Atkins, Ariel 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 06 /
Lomeli, Kevin 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 07 /
Hibmacronan, Christopher Nicholas 582 6th Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 08 /
Morenstein, Joshua 582 6th Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard, et al Thum & Partner Thum Mötsch Weickert Patentanwälte PartG mbB Siebertstr. 6 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19157427.6 | 23.12.2014 | [2019/27] | Priority number, date | US201361920225P | 23.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361920225 P | US201461936593P | 06.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461936593 P | US201461937755P | 10.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461937755 P | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3504989 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3504989 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/00, A61M15/06, H05B1/02, A61M11/04 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
A61M15/06 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A24F40/46 (IL,KR);
H05B1/0244 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A24B15/167 (GB,IL);
A24F40/10 (EP,GB,IL,US);
A24F40/40 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A24F40/42 (IL,KR,US);
A24F40/485 (EP,IL,KR);
A24F40/51 (IL,KR);
A24F40/53 (EP,IL,KR);
A24F40/57 (IL,KR);
A24F40/95 (IL);
A24F7/00 (KR);
A24F7/02 (KR);
A61M11/042 (EP,GB,IL,US);
A61M15/0015 (EP,IL,US);
A61M15/0016 (EP,IL,US);
A61M15/002 (EP,IL,US);
A61M15/0021 (IL,KR);
H01R13/6205 (GB,IL);
H01R31/06 (GB,IL);
H02J7/00 (IL,US);
H02J7/00309 (EP,GB,IL);
H02J7/0034 (EP,IL,US);
H02J7/0044 (EP,GB,IL,US);
H05B1/0202 (IL,KR);
H05B1/0227 (GB,IL);
H05B3/04 (GB,IL);
H05B3/44 (GB,IL);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2016/0024 (IL,KR);
A61M2205/128 (EP,IL);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/3606 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/3653 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/27] | A24F47/00, A61M15/06, H05B1/02, A61M11/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] |
Former [2019/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERDAMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2024/05] | English: | VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS | [2021/04] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DISPOSITIFS DE VAPORISATION | [2024/05] |
Former [2019/27] | VERDAMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2019/27] | VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS AND METHODS | ||
Former [2019/27] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DISPOSITIFS DE VAPORISATION | Examination procedure | 10.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 10.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14873186.2 / EP3086671 | EP18000692.6 / EP3430921 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.2022
10.03.2022
ADMISSIBLE Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH Opponent's representative Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | 02
08.03.2022
10.03.2022
ADMISSIBLE Smokeless.world GmbH Schlossstraße 19 82031 Grünwald / DE Opponent's representative Stellbrink & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al, et al Widenmayerstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | 03
09.03.2022
11.03.2022
ADMISSIBLE Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP, et al, et al 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.2022
10.03.2022
ADMISSIBLE Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH Opponent's representative Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | ||
02
08.03.2022
10.03.2022
ADMISSIBLE Smokeless.world GmbH Schlossstraße 19 82031 Grünwald / DE Opponent's representative Stellbrink & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al, et al Widenmayerstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | |||
03
09.03.2022
11.03.2022
ADMISSIBLE Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP, et al, et al 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | |||
Former [2022/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.2022
10.03.2022
ADMISSIBLE Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH Opponent's representative Ponder, William Anthony John, et al, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | ||
02
08.03.2022
10.03.2022
ADMISSIBLE Smokeless.world GmbH Schlossstraße 19 82031 Grünwald / DE Opponent's representative Stellbrink & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al, et al Widenmayerstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | |||
03
09.03.2022
11.03.2022
ADMISSIBLE Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP, et al, et al 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | 21.03.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.09.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.02.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.02.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 25.04.2024 | Appeal received No. T0386/24 | 25.04.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 01.07.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.03.2025 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.04.2025 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 11.03.2024 | Appeal received No. T0386/24 | 11.03.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 01.07.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.03.2025 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.04.2025 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 31.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2014 | AL | 09.06.2021 | AT | 09.06.2021 | CY | 09.06.2021 | DK | 09.06.2021 | EE | 09.06.2021 | FI | 09.06.2021 | HR | 09.06.2021 | LT | 09.06.2021 | LV | 09.06.2021 | MC | 09.06.2021 | MK | 09.06.2021 | MT | 09.06.2021 | RS | 09.06.2021 | SI | 09.06.2021 | SK | 09.06.2021 | SM | 09.06.2021 | BG | 09.09.2021 | NO | 09.09.2021 | IS | 09.10.2021 | LU | 23.12.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
MK | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
LU | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 23.12.2014 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
LU | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
LU | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
LU | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19619536 (SCHUCKMANN ALFRED VON [DE]); | [A]WO2009132793 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]); | [A]WO2012085203 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH], et al) | Examination | EP2113178 | Opposition | US5666977 | WO03094900 | US2005235991 | EP2113178 | WO2009132793 | EP2319334 | US2012048266 | WO2012085203 | WO2013116558 | WO2013152873 | US2014060554 | US2006047368 | US2008245363 | US2011094523 | US2011226236 | US2013306065 | US2014261495 | WO2014151040 | CA2641869 | KR20110084387 | KR200460784Y | US2013192623 | US2013220315 | CN203168032U | KR20130106009 | WO2013148810 | KR20130127412 | US2013319438 | CN203327953U |