EP3511841 - CHUNK HEADER INCORPORATING BINARY FLAGS AND CORRELATED VARIABLE-LENGTH FIELDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIVX, LLC 4350 La Jolla Village Drive, Suite 950 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2020/17] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states Sonic IP, Inc. 4790 Eastgate Mall Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOROUSHIAN, Kourosh 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
PRIYADARSHI, Shaiwal 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
BRANESS, Jason 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
OSBORNE, Roland 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 05 /
FRANTZ, William 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 06 /
VASHISHT-ROTA, Jerome 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 07 /
SALMONSEN, Dan 4780 Eastgate Mall SanDiego, CA 92121 / US | 08 /
FUNNELL, John 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 09 /
FLOYD, Michael 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 19157788.1 | 17.11.2008 | [2019/29] | Priority number, date | US20070988622P | 16.11.2007 Original published format: US 988622 P | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3511841 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3511841 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/438, G11B27/10, G11B27/34, G11B27/30, H04L29/08, H04N9/79 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
G06F16/4393 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (US);
G11B27/30 (US);
G11B27/34 (US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04N9/79 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2019/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CHUNK-HEADER MIT BINÄREN FLAGS UND KORRELIERTEN FELDERN VARIABLER LÄNGE | [2019/29] | English: | CHUNK HEADER INCORPORATING BINARY FLAGS AND CORRELATED VARIABLE-LENGTH FIELDS | [2019/29] | French: | EN-TÊTE DE SEGMENT INCORPORANT DES DRAPEAUX BINAIRES ET DES CHAMPS DE LONGUEUR VARIABLE CORRÉLÉS | [2019/29] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 14.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08849339.0 / EP2223230 | Divisional application(s) | EP21185993.9 / EP3951615 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2008 | AT | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | IE | 17.11.2021 | LU | 17.11.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IE | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IE | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5959690 (TOEBES VIII JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 41 * * column 3, line 16 - column 3, line 22 * * column 4, line 46 - column 4, line 51 * * column 6, line 21 - column 6, line 28 * * column 7, line 34 - column 10, line 47 * [I] 3-15; | [I]US6360368 (CHAWLA RAJEEV [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 4, line 6 - page 11, line 63; figures 1-15 *; | [A] - GISLE GRIMEN ET AL, Software-Based Copy Protection for Temporal Media During Dissemination and Playback, INFORMATION SECURITY AND CRYPTOLOGY - ICISC 2005 LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 362 - 377, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-33354-8, XP019031395 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11734727_29 | [A] - HUGHES G F, "Read channels for prepatterned media with trench playback", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20030901), vol. 39, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TMAG.2003.816479, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 2564 - 2566, XP011101546 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMAG.2003.816479 | by applicant | US20070988513 | US20080059547 | US20080109476 |