EP3540903 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MANAGING BI-DIRECTIONAL CONVERTER BASED BATTERY MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo King LLC 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | [2023/18] |
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states Thermo King Corporation 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUMACHER, Ryan Wayne 4107 Pebblebrook Drive Bloomington, Minnesota 55437 / US | 02 /
VANOUS, Michael James 5732 Sheridan Ave S. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55410 / US | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19161158.1 | 06.03.2019 | [2019/38] | Priority number, date | US201815921977 | 15.03.2018 Original published format: US201815921977 | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3540903 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
H02J7/0019 (EP,US);
B60R16/03 (CN);
B60R16/033 (CN,US);
H02J7/0013 (US);
H02J7/0016 (CN);
H01M10/4257 (EP,US);
H02J2207/20 (US);
H02J7/0025 (US);
H02J7/00711 (EP,US);
H02J7/007182 (EP,US);
H02M1/14 (US);
H02M1/44 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] |
Former [2019/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR VERWALTUNG BIDIREKTIONALER WANDLERBASIERTER BATTERIEMODULE | [2019/38] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MANAGING BI-DIRECTIONAL CONVERTER BASED BATTERY MODULES | [2019/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE GESTION DE MODULES DE BATTERIE BASÉS SUR UN CONVERTISSEUR BIDIRECTIONNEL | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 11.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19955406 (VB AUTOBATTERIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004257041 (NAGAOKA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [XYI]EP2068417 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,8,11,12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009]; figures 18-20 * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0162] * [Y] 2-6,10 [I] 7,9; | [Y]WO2011143158 (CODA AUTOMOTIVE INC [US], et al) [Y] 2-6,10 * figures 2,3; claims 2,13,14,15,16 *; | [AD]US8441228 (BRABEC LADISLAUS JOSEPH [US]) [AD] 1,8* the whole document * | by applicant | US8441228 | US8541905 | US9102241 | US9199543 |