EP3705607 - COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR THE PROTECTION OF PRECIOUS METAL SUBSTRATES BY AN ORGANIC NANOLAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COVENTYA S.p.A. Via 1 Maggio, snc 22060 Carugo (CO) / IT | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nelias, Coline Via Porta San Marco 214 81100 Pistoia / IT | 02 /
Bartoletti, Marianna Via Alcide De Gasperi n°10 51037 Montale / IT | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 19161674.7 | 08.03.2019 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705607 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C25D9/02, C09D5/00, C23F11/14, C23F11/16, C25D13/12 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
C25D9/02 (EP);
C09D5/00 (EP);
C23C22/52 (EP);
C23C22/58 (EP);
C23C22/60 (EP);
C23C22/63 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ VON EDELMETALLSUBSTRATEN DURCH EINE ORGANISCHE NANOSCHICHT | [2020/37] | English: | COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR THE PROTECTION OF PRECIOUS METAL SUBSTRATES BY AN ORGANIC NANOLAYER | [2020/37] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION DE SUBSTRATS DE MÉTAL PRÉCIEUX PAR UNE NANOCOUCHE ORGANIQUE | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1255750 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 * page 2, lines 14-48 *; | [X]DE2021453 (MERCK PATENT GMBH) [X] 1-4,6-9 * example 1 *; | [X]US2016168724 (KINLEN PATRICK J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraph [0088]; claims 1,10 *; | [Y]US2010151263 (ABYS JOSEPH A [US], et al) [Y] 9-15 * paragraphs [0083] - [0085] *; | [A]EP3312309 (COVENTYA S P A [IT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - Vinod K Gupta ET AL, "Voltammetric Behaviour of 2-Amino-5-methyl-I ,3,4-thiadiazole at a Pyrolytic Graphite Elect rode", J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS, (19900101), URL: https://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/articlepdf/1990/p2/p29900001845, XP055621894 [X] 1-4,6-9 * Experimental section;; figure 1 * | [X] - SKRZYPEK S ET AL, "Cathodic Stripping Voltammetry of 2-Mercapto-5-Methyl-1,3,4-Thiadiazol and 2,5-Dimercapto-1,3,4-Thiadiazol at a Controlled-Growth Mercury Drop Electrode", JOURNAL OF ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20051001), vol. 60, no. 10, ISSN 1608-3199, pages 978 - 981, XP019297766 [X] 1-4,7-9 * Experimental section;; figure 1 * | [Y] - FOUZIA ALTAF ET AL, "Surface protection of copper by azoles in borate buffers-voltammetric and impedance analysis", JOURNAL OF ELECTROANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 659, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JELECHEM.2011.05.013, ISSN 1572-6657, (20110518), pages 134 - 142, (20110525), XP028098507 [Y] 9-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jelechem.2011.05.013 | by applicant | US9914838 | WO2013028309 | WO2005021836 | US2017002211 | WO2009067446 |