EP3570328 - ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DIODE DISPLAY INCLUDING COLOR CONVERSION PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, In Seok 2068-13, Hwadong-ro, Idong-myeon, Pocheon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
JOO, Sun-Kyu 634-1601, 76, Bongyeong-ro 1517beon-gil Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
KIM, Byung-Chul 833-2001, 26, Yeongtong-ro 290beon-gil Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
KIM, In Ok 103-1801, 615, Sumogwon-ro, Osan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
LEE, Gak Seok 349-2004, 171, Dongtanjungang-ro, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
JANG, Chang-Soon 14-508, 74, Gongneung-ro 34-gil, Nowon-gu Seoul / KR | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 19166322.8 | 29.03.2019 | [2019/47] | Priority number, date | KR20180054711 | 14.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180054711 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570328 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L51/52 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
H10K59/38 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K30/87 (KR);
H10K50/854 (US);
H10K59/126 (US);
H10K59/877 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K59/879 (EP,CN,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] |
Former [2019/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGE MIT ORGANISCHEN LICHTEMITTIERENDEN DIODEN MIT FARBUMWANDLUNGSTAFEL | [2019/47] | English: | ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DIODE DISPLAY INCLUDING COLOR CONVERSION PANEL | [2019/47] | French: | AFFICHEUR À DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE ORGANIQUE COMPRENANT UN PANNEAU DE CONVERSION DE COULEUR | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 20.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004139849 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS, et al); | [A]JP2005002290 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK, et al); | [X]JP2005123088 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS); | [I]JP2009224063 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS); | [XI]WO2013111696 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [XP]EP3339920 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) |