EP3579394 - IMPROVED DC BUS REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transocean Sedco Forex Ventures Ltd. 4 Greenway Plaza Houston, TX 77046 / US | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourgeau, Edward Peter Kenneth 14727 Kellywood Lane Houston, TX 77079 / US | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 19166755.9 | 15.10.2009 | [2019/50] | Priority number, date | US20080269703 | 12.11.2008 Original published format: US 269703 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579394 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/17, H02M7/23, H02M7/81, H02M7/08 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
H02M7/23 (EP,US);
H02J3/36 (KR);
H02J3/04 (KR);
H02M7/08 (EP,US);
H02M7/17 (EP,US);
H02M7/81 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER GLEICHSTROMSCHIENENREGULATOR | [2019/50] | English: | IMPROVED DC BUS REGULATOR | [2019/50] | French: | RÉGULATEUR DE BUS CC AMÉLIORÉ | [2019/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 03.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09826503.6 / EP2351179 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH05244773 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [I] 6 * abstract *; | [IY]JPH08205560 (TOSHIBA CORP) [I] 1,2,6,7,10-12 * abstract * [Y] 3-5,8,9; | [I]JPH08251947 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [I] 1,6* figure 9 *; | [XY]JPH09163633 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0014]; figure 1 * [Y] 5; | [Y]US2005235865 (KUMAR AJITH KUTTANNAIR [US]) [Y] 3,4,8,9 * paragraphs [0103] , [0104]; figure 9a * * paragraph [0013]; figure 1b * |