EP3722817 - ACTIVE BIMODAL AFM OPERATION FOR MEASUREMENTS OF OPTICAL INTERACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states attocube systems AG Eglfinger Weg 2 85540 Haar / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Neaspec GmbH Eglfinger Weg 2 85540 Haar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Govyadinov, Alexander A. 85540 Haar / DE | 02 /
Huth, Florian 85540 Haar / DE | 03 /
Malovichko, Ivan 85540 Haar / DE | 04 /
Diem, Marcus 85540 Haar / DE | [2022/19] |
Former [2020/42] | 01 /
Govyadinov, Alexander A. Neaspec GmbH c/o Neaspec GmbH Eglfinger Weg 2 85540 Haar / DE | ||
02 /
Huth, Florian Neaspec GmbH c/o Neaspec GmbH Eglfinger Weg 2 85540 Haar / DE | |||
03 /
Malovichko, Ivan Neaspec GmbH c/o Neaspec GmbH Eglfinger Weg 2 85540 Haar / DE | |||
04 /
Diem, Marcus Neaspec GmbH c/o Neaspec GmbH Eglfinger Weg 2 85540 Haar / DE | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19168958.7 | 12.04.2019 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722817 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3722817 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01Q60/32, G01Q60/34 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
G01Q60/34 (EP,US);
G01Q30/02 (US);
G01Q60/30 (US);
G01Q60/363 (EP,US);
G01Q60/38 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AKTIVER BIMODALER AFM-BETRIEB ZUR MESSUNGEN OPTISCHER INTERAKTION | [2020/42] | English: | ACTIVE BIMODAL AFM OPERATION FOR MEASUREMENTS OF OPTICAL INTERACTION | [2020/42] | French: | OPÉRATION BIMODALE AFM ACTIVE POUR DES MESURES D'INTERACTION OPTIQUE | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 30.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.05.2022 | CZ | 11.05.2022 | DK | 11.05.2022 | EE | 11.05.2022 | ES | 11.05.2022 | FI | 11.05.2022 | HR | 11.05.2022 | IT | 11.05.2022 | LT | 11.05.2022 | LV | 11.05.2022 | MC | 11.05.2022 | NL | 11.05.2022 | PL | 11.05.2022 | RO | 11.05.2022 | RS | 11.05.2022 | SE | 11.05.2022 | SI | 11.05.2022 | SK | 11.05.2022 | SM | 11.05.2022 | BG | 11.08.2022 | NO | 11.08.2022 | GR | 12.08.2022 | IS | 11.09.2022 | PT | 12.09.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 11.05.2022 | |
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | ES | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | ES | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]US9134341 (PRATER CRAIG [US], et al) [YD] 1,3-15 * figures 3,4 * * column 5, line 25 - column 8, line 41 * * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 21 * [A] 16; | [YA] - DANA C KOHLGRAF-OWENS ET AL, "Multi-frequency near-field scanning optical microscopy", NANOTECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1088/0957-4484/25/3/035203, ISSN 0957-4484, (20131217), page 35203, (20131217), XP020256585 [Y] 16 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.3] * * paragraph [0003] * [A] 1,3-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/25/3/035203 | [Y] - ELENA T. HERRUZO ET AL, "Fast nanomechanical spectroscopy of soft matter", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, GB, (20140120), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/ncomms4126, ISSN 2041-1723, XP055294212 [Y] 1,3-16 * figure 1 * * paragraph [Bimodal] - paragraph [Theory] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms4126 | by applicant | US8001830 | WO2012021727 | US2012204296 | US8402819 | US9134341 | - AMBROSIO, A.; DEVLIN, R. C.; CAPASSO, F.; WILSON, W. L., "Observation of Nanoscale Refractive Index Contrast via Photoinduced Force Microscopy", ACS Photonics, vol. 4, no. 4, (20170000), pages 846 - 851, URL: https://doi.org/10.1021/acsphotonics.6b00911 | - CVITKOVIC, A.; OCELIC, N.; HILLENBRAND, R., "Analytical model for quantitative prediction of material contrasts in scattering-type near-field optical microscopy", Optics Express, vol. 15, no. 14, doi:doi:10.1364/OE.15.008550, (20070000), pages 8550 - 8565, URL: https://doi.org/10.1364/OE.15.008550, XP055017766 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.15.008550 | - DAZZI, A.; PRAZERES, R.; GLOTIN, F.; ORTEGA, J. M., "Local infrared microspectroscopy with subwavelength spatial resolution with an atomic force microscope tip used as a photothermal sensor", Optics Letters, vol. 30, no. 18, doi:doi:10.1364/OL.30.002388, (20050000), page 2388, URL: https://doi.org/1 0.1364/OL.30.002388, XP007911868 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.30.002388 | - HUBER, A. J.; KEILMANN, F.; WITTBORN, J.; AIZPURUA, J.; HILLENBRAND, R., "Terahertz near-field nanoscopy of mobile carriers in single semiconductor nanodevices", Nano Letters, vol. 8, no. 11, (20080000), pages 3766 - 3770, URL: https://doi.org/10.1021/nl802086x | - JAHNG, J.; BROCIOUS, J.; FISHMAN, D. A.; HUANG, F.; LI, X.; TAMMA, V. A.; POTMA, E. O., "Gradient and scattering forces in photoinduced force microscopy", Physical Review B - Condensed Matter and Materials Physics, vol. 90, no. 15, (20140000), page 155417, URL: https://doi.org/1 O. 1 103/PhysRevB.90. 155417 | - LOZANO, J. R.; KIRACOFE, D.; MELCHER, J.; GARCIA, R.; RAMAN, A., "Calibration of higher eigenmode spring constants of atomic force microscope cantilevers", Nanotechnology, vol. 21, no. 46, doi:doi:10.1088/0957-4484/21/46/465502, (20100000), URL: https://doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/21/46/465502, XP020199964 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/21/46/465502 | - O'CALLAHAN, B. T.; YAN, J.; MENGES, F.; MULLER, E. A.; RASCHKE, M. B., "Photoinduced Tip-Sample Forces for Chemical Nanoimaging and Spectroscopy", Nano Letters, vol. 18, no. 9, (20180000), pages 5499 - 5505, URL: https://doi.org/10.1021/acs.nanolett.8b01899 | - ORDAL, M. A; BELL, R. J.; ALEXANDER, R. W.; LONG, L. L.; QUERRY, M. R., "Optical properties of fourteen metals in the infrared and far infrared: Al, Co, Cu, Au, Fe, Pb, Mo, Ni, Pd, Pt, Ag, Ti, V, and W", Applied Optics, vol. 24, no. 24, (19850000), page 4493, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/18224235 | - TUTEJA, M.; KANG, M.; LEAL, C.; CENTRONE, A., "Nanoscale partitioning of paclitaxel in hybrid lipid-polymer membranes", Analyst, vol. 143, no. 16, (20180000), pages 3808 - 3813, URL: https://doi.org/10.1039/c8an00838h | - YANG, H. U.; RASCHKE, M. B., Optical gradient force nano-imaging and - spectroscopy, 1-5, (20150000), URL: http://arxiv.org/abs/1508.06358 |