EP3726466 - AUTONOMOUS LEVEL IDENTIFICATION OF ANATOMICAL BONY STRUCTURES ON 3D MEDICAL IMAGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holo Surgical Inc. 520 Lake Cook Rd. Suite 315 Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [2023/17] |
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states Holo Surgical Inc. 1415 West 37th Street Chicago, IL 60609 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siemionow, Kris B. 1300 North Astor Chicago, IL Illinois 60610 / US | 02 /
Luciano, Cristian J. 9222 S California Ave Evergreen Park, IL Illinois 60805 / US | 03 /
Trzmiel, Michal Kasprowicza 119E m. 57 01-949 Warszawa / PL | 04 /
Mejia Orozco, Edwing Isaac Kasprowicza 119E m. 57 01-949 Warszawa / PL | 05 /
Lewicki, Paul 296 Woodward Blvd. Tulsa, OK 74114 / US | [2021/07] |
Former [2020/43] | 01 /
Siemionow, Kris B. 1300 North Astor Chicago, IL Illinois 60610 / US | ||
02 /
Luciano, Cristian J. 9222 S California Ave Evergreen Park, IL Illinois 60805 / US | |||
03 /
Trzmiel, Michal Kasprowicza 119E m. 57 01-949 Warszawa / PL | |||
04 /
Mejia Orozco, Edwing Isaac Kasprowicza 119E m. 57 01-949 Warszawa / PL | Representative(s) | Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o Ul. Kilinskiego 185 90-348 Lodz / PL | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 19169136.9 | 15.04.2019 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726466 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/11 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP);
G06T15/08 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T2207/10072 (EP);
G06T2207/10081 (EP);
G06T2207/10088 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2020/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTONOME LEVEL-IDENTIFIKATION ANATOMISCHER KNÖCHERNER STRUKTUREN IN MEDIZINISCHEN 3D-BILDERN | [2020/43] | English: | AUTONOMOUS LEVEL IDENTIFICATION OF ANATOMICAL BONY STRUCTURES ON 3D MEDICAL IMAGERY | [2020/43] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE NIVEAU AUTONOME DE STRUCTURES OSSEUSES ANATOMIQUES DANS UNE IMAGERIE MÉDICALE EN 3D | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 21.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - Ana Jiménez-Pastor ET AL, "Automatic localization and identification of vertebrae in spine CT scans by combining Deep Learning with morphological image processing techniques", European Congress of Radiology (ECR) 2018, (20180304), URL: https://quibim.com/wp-content/uploads/2018/03/3_ECR2018_AJP.pdf, (20190927), XP055626761 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - YANG DONG ET AL, Deep Image-to-Image Recurrent Network with Shape Basis Learning for Automatic Vertebra Labeling in Large-Scale 3D CT Volumes, ROBOCUP 2008: ROBOCUP 2008: ROBOT SOCCER WORLD CUP XII; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, CHAM, PAGE(S) 498 - 506, (20170904), ISBN 978-3-319-10403-4, XP047502790 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-66179-7_57 | by applicant | EP17195826 | - JUN MA et al., "Hierarchical Segmentation and Identification of Thoracic Vertebra Using Learning-Based Edge Detection and Coarse-to-Fine Deformable Model", Medical Image Computing and Computer-Assisted Intervention, MICCAI, (20100000), doi:doi:10.1007/978-3-642-15705-9_3, pages 19 - 27, XP047462949 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-15705-9_3 |