EP3726199 - PARTICLE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WoePal GmbH Grabenstr. 13 54311 Trierweiler-Sirzenich / DE | [2023/23] |
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states WoePal UG Grabenstr. 13 54311 Trierweiler-Sirzenich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palzer, Stefan WoePal UG Grabenstr. 13 54311 Trierweiler-Sirzenich / DE | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Calysta NV Lambroekstraat 5a 1831 Diegem / BE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 19169282.1 | 15.04.2019 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726199 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3726199 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/37, G01N21/53 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G01N21/37 (EP);
G01N21/534 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] |
Former [2020/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PARTIKELSENSOR | [2020/43] | English: | PARTICLE SENSOR | [2020/43] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PARTICULES | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 18.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - SCHOLZ LOUISA ET AL, "Miniature Low-Cost Carbon Dioxide Sensor for Mobile Devices", IEEE SENSORS JOURNAL, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 17, no. 9, doi:10.1109/JSEN.2017.2682638, ISSN 1530-437X, (201705), pages 2889 - 2895, (20170410), XP011645739 [X] 1 * abstract * * column 2890, paragraph II. - page 2891; figure 3 * [Y] 2 [I] 12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSEN.2017.2682638 | [XYI] - KNOBELSPIES STEFAN ET AL, "Low-cost gas sensing system for the reliable and precise measurement of methane, carbon dioxide and hydrogen sulfide in natural gas and biomethane", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20160322), vol. 236, doi:10.1016/J.SNB.2016.03.022, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 885 - 892, XP029700012 [X] 1-3,8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [002.]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 2 [I] 4-6,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2016.03.022 | [XI] - VALENTIN WITTSTOCK ET AL, "Design of a LED-based sensor for monitoring the lower explosion limit of methane", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL, NL, (201708), vol. 247, doi:10.1016/j.snb.2017.03.086, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 930 - 939, XP055633578 [X] 1,7,10,11 * paragraph [002.]; figures 1-3 * [I] 12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2017.03.086 | by applicant | DE730478 | WO9747957 |