EP3726852 - ADAPTATION OF FREQUENCY AND POSITIONING OF A HEARING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engel, Thomas Härtsfeldstraße 146 73432 Aalen / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 19169734.1 | 17.04.2019 | [2020/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726852 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
H04R25/70 (EP);
H04R25/606 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANPASSUNG DER FREQUENZ UND EINBAULAGE EINES HÖRGERÄTES | [2020/43] | English: | ADAPTATION OF FREQUENCY AND POSITIONING OF A HEARING AID | [2020/43] | French: | AJUSTEMENT DE LA FRÉQUENCE ET POSITION DE MONTAGE D'UN APPAREIL AUDITIF | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004141543 (JENSEN PREBEN DAMGARD [DK], et al) [Y] 2-9,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1802170 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2013237754 (BERGLUND NATHANAEL [US], et al) [Y] 2-9,11* the whole document *; | [Y] - WALSH TIMOTHY ET AL, "Boundary element modeling of the external human auditory system", THE JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS FOR THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20040301), vol. 115, no. 3, doi:10.1121/1.1643360, ISSN 0001-4966, pages 1033 - 1043, XP012072153 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.1643360 | [Y] - MICHAEL R STINSON ET AL, "Specification of the geometry of the human ear canal for the prediction of sound-pressure level distribution", THE JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS FOR THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 85, no. 6, doi:Hörgeräteschale, ISSN 0001-4966, (19890601), pages 2492 - 2503, XP007913201 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * |