EP3733309 - CAPACITIVE MICRO-MACHINED ULTRASOUND TRANSDUCER (CMUT) DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN RENS, Antonia Cornelia c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 19171719.8 | 30.04.2019 | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3733309 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/02 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
B06B1/0207 (EP,US);
B06B1/0292 (EP,US);
A61B8/4494 (US);
G01S15/8925 (US);
G01S15/8993 (US);
G01S7/52046 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVE MIKROBEARBEITETE ULTRASCHALLWANDLER (CMUT)-VORRICHTUNGEN | [2020/45] | English: | CAPACITIVE MICRO-MACHINED ULTRASOUND TRANSDUCER (CMUT) DEVICES | [2020/45] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE TRANSDUCTEUR ULTRASONORE MICRO-USINÉ CAPACITIF (CMUT) | [2020/45] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/41] | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2015086413 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [I] 1-7,10-12 * claims 1 9, 10 * * page 2, line 5 - line 16 * * page 4, line 1 - line 3 * * page 4, line 16 - line 19 * * page 8, line 2 - line 5 * * page 13, line 11 - line 14 * * page 13, line 25 - line 27 * * page 13, line 32 * * page 17, line 10 - line 13 * * figures 1, 3a, 6, 7 * [A] 8,9; | [IA]US2018164418 (ZEMP ROGER [CA], et al) [I] 1,5,7,10-12 * claims 13, 19 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0045] * * figure 3 * [A] 2-4,6,8,9; | [A]WO2019030045 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * claims 1, 2, 3 ** figure 5 * | by applicant | US5997479 | US6013032 | US6283919 | US6443896 | US6458083 | US6530885 | US6623432 | US7293462 |