EP3575616 - BARREL NUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tulloch, William c/o Airbus Operations Ltd., IP Dept. Pegasus House, Aerospace Avenue, Filton Bristol, BS34 7PA / GB | 02 /
Broomfield, Pat c/o Airbus Operations Ltd., IP Dept. Pegasus House, Aerospace Avenue, Filton Bristol, BS34 7PA / GB | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Claydon, Michelle Leonie Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House, Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 19174631.2 | 15.05.2019 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | GB20180008978 | 01.06.2018 Original published format: GB 201808978 | GB20190000249 | 08.01.2019 Original published format: GB 201900249 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3575616 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/02, F16B37/04, F16B43/02 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
F16B5/025 (EP);
B64C1/26 (CN);
F16B37/047 (EP,US);
B64D27/40 (CN,US);
F16B37/00 (CN);
F16B37/046 (EP);
F16B43/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZYLINDERMUTTER | [2019/49] | English: | BARREL NUT | [2019/49] | French: | ÉCROU DE TONNEAU | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2789457 (ALLEN MAX A) [X] 1-6,8-10,13,14 * Claim 1; abstract; Figures 1-5 * [I] 7,11,12,15; | [XI]GB823188 (FREDERICK WILLIAM ROHE) [X] 1-7,10-14 * Claim 1; Figures 1-6page 2, lines 40-51 * [I] 8,9,15; | [A]US3192982 (ROHE FREDERICK W, et al) [A] 11,12 * Claim 1, Figure 1 *; | [A]US3205927 (PHELAN CHARLES S) [A] 15 * Column 3, lines 11-15 *; | [XI]US3208496 (PHELAN CHARLES S) [X] 1-7,10-14 * Claims 1-3; Figures 1-7; column 2, lines 58-62; column 2, lines 34-38 * [I] 8,9,15; | [A]FR3026151 (DASSAULT AVIAT [FR]) [A] 11,12* Claims 1,7; Figures 1-5 * |