EP3572020 - BONE FIXATION ASSEMBLY WITH ENLARGED ANGLE OF INCLINATION FOR A BONE ANCHOR TO A FAVORED SIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Josefstr. 5 78166 Donaueschingen / DE | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEDERMANN, Markku Paramount Bay, 2020 North Bayshore Drive Unit 3807 Miami, FL Florida 33137 / US | [2022/03] |
Former [2019/48] | 01 /
BIEDERMANN, Markku Paramount Bay, 2020 North Bayshore Drive Unit 3807 Miami, FL 33137 / US | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 19174971.2 | 16.05.2019 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | US201815982488 | 17.05.2018 Original published format: US201815982488 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572020 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3572020 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/86, // A61B17/80 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
A61B17/8014 (EP);
A61B17/8057 (EP,US);
A61B17/80 (EP);
A61B17/8033 (EP);
A61B17/8047 (EP);
A61B17/8052 (EP);
A61B17/808 (CN);
A61B17/8605 (CN);
A61B17/8625 (CN);
A61B2017/564 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KNOCHENFIXIERUNGSANORDNUNG MIT VERGRÖSSERTEM NEIGUNGSWINKEL FÜR EINEN KNOCHENANKER ZU EINER BEVORZUGTEN SEITE | [2019/48] | English: | BONE FIXATION ASSEMBLY WITH ENLARGED ANGLE OF INCLINATION FOR A BONE ANCHOR TO A FAVORED SIDE | [2019/48] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE FIXATION OSSEUSE À ANGLE D'INCLINAISON ÉLARGI POUR UN ANCRAGE OSSEUX SUR UN CÔTÉ PRIVILÉGIÉ | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 03.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2019 | AL | 13.04.2022 | AT | 13.04.2022 | CY | 13.04.2022 | CZ | 13.04.2022 | DK | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | ES | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | IT | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | NL | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SE | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | IE | 16.05.2022 | LU | 16.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | FR | 13.06.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.05.2019 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 13.06.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 13.06.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 13.06.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
FR | 13.06.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 13.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1220645 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0076]; figures 12-14 *; | [A]US2002183752 (STEINER BEATRICE [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2011109127 (SYNTHES USA LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011]; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]US2015094775 (BATSCH THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0052]; figures 3-6 *; | [Y]EP2932927 (BIEDERMANN TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2018000496 (LANGDALE EVAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0098]; figures 8A-8C * * paragraph [0102]; figures 12A-12D * | by applicant | US2012059425 | US8409260 | - RUEDI TPBUCKLEY RMORAN CG, AO Principles of Fracture Management, Thieme-Verlag, (20070000), vol. 1 |