EP3738803 - COMMERCIAL VEHICLE WITH A FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmitz Cargobull AG Siemensstraße 50 48341 Altenberge / DE | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beelmann, Reinhard Holtwicker Straße 21 45721 Haltern am See / DE | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19175117.1 | 17.05.2019 | [2020/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738803 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60H1/26, B60P3/20, F25D19/00 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
B60H1/00014 (EP);
B60H1/26 (EP);
B60P3/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUTZFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM AUFBAU | [2020/47] | English: | COMMERCIAL VEHICLE WITH A FRAME | [2020/47] | French: | VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE DOTÉ D'UNE SUPERSTRUCTURE | [2020/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6945071 (SIMEONE ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 9,13; | [XYI]US2005241326 (YOONG HAMMOND [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,13,15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0036] , [0040]; figures 3,4-10 * [Y] 9 [I] 14; | [Y]US2010112924 (ALEXANDER PAUL W [US], et al) [Y] 9* paragraph [0081]; figure 2 * |