EP3579242 - IDENTIFYING AND ACCESSING DATA OF A PERSON FOR USE OF A PERSONAL EMERGENCY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essence Smartcare Ltd Ackerstein Buildings Building D, 7th Floor 12 Abba Eben Boulevard 4672530 Herzlia Pituach / IL | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katz, Barak 16 Yael Rom St, Apt. 6 4906217 Herzeliya Pituach / IL | 02 /
Biran, Alon Yechezkel 183 Hayarkon Street 6345332 Tel Aviv-Jaffa / IL | 03 /
Oppenheim, Yaron 15 Lotus St. 46417 Herzliya / IL | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Pinney, Matthew David Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19177930.5 | 03.06.2019 | [2019/50] | Priority number, date | LU20180100820 | 04.06.2018 Original published format: LU 100820 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579242 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16H10/60 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP);
G08B25/016 (US);
G06Q50/265 (US);
G08B25/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] |
Former [2019/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND ZUGRIFF AUF DATEN EINER PERSON ZUR VERWENDUNG EINER PERSÖNLICHEN NOTFALLVORRICHTUNG | [2019/50] | English: | IDENTIFYING AND ACCESSING DATA OF A PERSON FOR USE OF A PERSONAL EMERGENCY DEVICE | [2019/50] | French: | IDENTIFICATION ET ACCÈS AUX DONNÉES D'UNE PERSONNE POUR UTILISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF D'URGENCE PERSONNELLE | [2019/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 10.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/26] | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015154364 (BIASI JOHN J [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0522] - paragraph [0531] * * paragraph [0663] - paragraph [0664] * * paragraph [0185] ** paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * |