EP3748755 - CELL BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renata AG Kreuzenstrasse 30 4452 Itingen / CH | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiaojun Hauptstrasse 29 4455 Zunzgen / CH | 02 /
FREY, Remo Rankgasse 20 4425 Titterten / CH | 03 /
HAERING, Pascal Kilchmattstrasse 16 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19178219.2 | 04.06.2019 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3748755 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01M2/26, H01M2/02, H01M2/20 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
H01M10/0427 (EP,CH);
H01M50/56 (US);
H01M10/0463 (EP);
H01M10/0585 (CH);
H01M50/109 (EP,US);
H01M50/50 (EP,CH,US);
H01M50/536 (EP,CH,US);
H01M50/538 (US);
H01M50/54 (EP,CH,US);
H01M50/548 (US);
H01M50/566 (US);
H01M10/052 (US);
H01M2220/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLBATTERIE | [2020/50] | English: | CELL BATTERY | [2020/50] | French: | BATTERIE CELLULAIRE | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/48] | 16.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2011081941 (HITACHI MAXELL) [X] 1,3-8,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0 20] , [0 21] , [0 23] , [0 24] , [0 26] * * figures 1-3, 5, 6 * [Y] 9,10 [I] 12; | [YD]EP3139434 (RENATA AG [CH]) [YD] 9,10 * paragraphs [0023] - [0029] ** figures 1, 2 *; | [X]CA3043360 (CHONGQING VDL ELECTRONICS CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 38] , [0 45] , [0 56] - [0058] - [0 70] * * figures 2, 3 * | by applicant | US3907599 | EP2610945 | EP3139434 |