EP3572423 - ANTI-HUMAN PAPILLOMAVIRUS 16 E6 T CELL RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The United States of America, as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6701 Rockledge Drive, Suite 700, MSC 7788 Bethesda, Maryland 20892-7788 / US | [2023/48] |
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states The U.S.A. as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINRICHS, Christian S. 5814 Melvern Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 02 /
ROSENBERG, Steven A. 10104 Iron Gate Road Potomac, MD 20854 / US | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/49] |
Former [2019/48] | Huenges, Martin Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19180239.6 | 14.07.2014 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | US201361846167P | 15.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361846167 P | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572423 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3572423 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/725 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4632 (EP);
A61K39/464491 (EP);
A61K39/464838 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/2809 (US);
G01N33/566 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | T-ZELL-REZEPTOREN GEGEN MENSCHLICHES PAPILLOMAVIRUS 16 E6 | [2019/48] | English: | ANTI-HUMAN PAPILLOMAVIRUS 16 E6 T CELL RECEPTORS | [2019/48] | French: | RÉCEPTEURS DE LYMPHOCYTES T ANTI-PAPILLOMAVIRUS HUMAIN 16 E6 | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 22.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14748353.1 / EP3022223 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007131092 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [A] 1-15* example -; claim - *; | [A] - SCHOLTEN K B J ET AL, "Promiscuous behavior of HPV16E6 specific T cell receptor beta chains hampers functional expression in TCR transgenic T cells, which can be restored in part by genetic modification", CELLULAR ONCOLOGY, IOS PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20100101), vol. 32, no. 1-2, ISSN 1570-5870, pages 43 - 56, XP009180698 [A] 1-15 * abstract; results; discussion; page 44, column r, paragraph 3 * * page 54, column l, paragraph 2 * | [A] - LYONS G E, "Immunotherapeutic strategies against human papillomavirus induced cervical cancer", DISSERTATION,, (200412), page 157pp, XP009180711 [A] 1-15 * page 79, paragraph 2 - page 103, paragraph 1; figures 17-30 * | by applicant | EP0239400 | GB2188638 | US5087616 | US5225539 | US5449752 | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5585089 | US5639641 | US5693761 | US5714352 | US6265150 | US2002197266 | US8034334 | US2012244133 | US8383099 | - CHOI et al., Mol. Biotechnol., (20050000), vol. 31, pages 193 - 202 | - HUDECZ, F., Methods Mol. Biol., (20050000), vol. 298, pages 209 - 223 | - PEDERSEN et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19940000), vol. 235, pages 959 - 973 | - KIRIN et al., Inorg Chem., (20050000), vol. 44, no. 15, pages 5405 - 5415 | - DUDLEY et al., J. Immunother., (20030000), vol. 26, pages 332 - 42 | - RIDDELL et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19900000), vol. 128, pages 189 - 201 | - KOHLERMILSTEIN, Eur. J. Immunol., (19760000), vol. 5, pages 511 - 519 | - HASKARDARCHER, J. Immunol. Methods, (19840000), vol. 74, no. 2, pages 361 - 67 | - RODER et al., Methods Enzymol., (19860000), vol. 121, pages 140 - 67 | - HUSE et al., Science, (19890000), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 81 | - REITER et al., Protein Engineering, (19940000), vol. 7, pages 697 - 704 |