EP3584210 - LIFTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states High Performance Lifting Equipment B.V. Swammerdamlaan 10 6721 BK Bennekom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/52] | For all designated states High Performance Lifting Equipment B.V. Swammerdamlaan 10 Bennekom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER KOLK, Boris Harold Johan Swammerdamlaan 10 6721 BK Bennekom / NL | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 19180432.7 | 17.06.2019 | [2019/52] | Priority number, date | NL20182021139 | 18.06.2018 Original published format: NL 2021139 | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3584210 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3584210 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/34 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
B66C1/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] |
Former [2019/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HEBEWERKZEUG | [2019/52] | English: | LIFTING TOOL | [2019/52] | French: | OUTIL DE LEVAGE | [2019/52] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 18.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1258056 (INTERCONTINENTALE TECHNIK GES, et al); | [Y]CN203345928U (SHANGHAI XIANGJIN IND MACHINERY GROUP CO LTD); | [YA]CN105480852 (ANHUI CHAOSHENG HOISTING MACHINERY CO LTD); | [YA]US2017241469 (PAUTSCH INGO [DE], et al); | Examination | US4850630 | by applicant | US3675961 | US4850630 | US2009008953 | US2017241469 |