EP3734853 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCEMENT ON BASIS SUBSET INDICATION FOR TWO-CODEBOOK BASED CSI REPORTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramireddy, Venkatesh C/O Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Grossmann, Marcus C/O Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 ERLANGEN / DE | 03 /
Landmann, Markus C/O Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 ERLANGEN / DE | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 19191235.1 | 12.08.2019 | [2020/45] | Priority number, date | EP20190172422 | 02.05.2019 Original published format: EP 19172422 | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734853 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0417, H04B7/0456, H04B7/06 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
H04B7/0417 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0626 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0663 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0478 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0621 (EP);
H04B7/063 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG AUF BASIS VON UNTERGRUPPENANZEIGE FÜR AUF ZWEI CODEBÜCHERN BASIERENDE CSI-MELDUNG | [2020/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCEMENT ON BASIS SUBSET INDICATION FOR TWO-CODEBOOK BASED CSI REPORTING | [2020/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AMÉLIORATION D'INDICATION DE SOUS-ENSEMBLE DE BASE POUR UN REPORTING CSI BASÉ SUR DEUX LIVRES DE CODES | [2020/45] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/41] | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - FRAUNHOFER IIS ET AL, "Enhancements on Type-II CSI reporting", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20181112 - 20181116, (20181111), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1813130, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/R1%2D1813130%2Ezip, (20181111), XP051555112 [X] 1-3,23 * the whole document * [A] 4-21 [I] 22 | [A] - CATT, "Discussions on Type II CSI enhancement", vol. RAN WG1, no. Taipei; 20190121 - 20190125, (20190112), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1900338, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5FAH/NR%5FAH%5F1901/Docs/R1%2D1900338%2Ezip, (20190112), XP051575947 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Frequency parametrization for Type II CSI feedback", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1714305 FREQUENCY PARAMETRIZATION FOR TYPE II CSI CODEBOOK, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051317091 [A] 1-23 * section 2; page 1 - page 5; figures 1-3 * | [A] - NEC, "Discussion on CSI Reporting", vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an, China; 20190408 - 20190412, (20190407), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1904662 DISCUSSION ON CSI REPORTING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/R1%2D1904662%2Ezip, (20190407), XP051699865 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * |