EP3779226 - A GUIDE ASSEMBLY FOR A DISC BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knoop, Dietmar c/o Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran, Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Foot, Paul Matthew James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/07] | Foot, Paul Matthew James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London Greater London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19192147.7 | 16.08.2019 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779226 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3779226 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/2265 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
F16D55/22655 (EP,CN,US);
F16D65/0087 (US);
F16D55/227 (CN);
B60T1/065 (US);
F16D2055/007 (US);
F16D2250/0061 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE SCHEIBENBREMSE | [2021/07] | English: | A GUIDE ASSEMBLY FOR A DISC BRAKE | [2021/07] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE GUIDAGE POUR FREIN À DISQUE | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 13.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.04.2023
06.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE Opponent's representative Specht, Peter Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2023/19] | 26.04.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.09.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.07.2022 | AT | 06.07.2022 | CY | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | DK | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | ES | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | IT | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | NL | 06.07.2022 | PL | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SE | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | IE | 16.08.2022 | LU | 16.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | FR | 06.09.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | PT | 07.11.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 06.09.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 06.09.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 06.09.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 06.09.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 06.07.2022 | |
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 06.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4311219 (WATANABE YUSHIYO, et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * column 2, line 55 - line 58; figure 1 * [I] 4,11-15; | [A]GB2093135 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XI]EP3051163 (MERITOR HEAVY VEHICLE BRAKING [GB]) [X] 1-3,11-14 * paragraphs [0083] , [0085] , [0094]; figure 7 * [I] 15 | Opposition | DE2845275 | US4311219 | GB2093135 | DE3508039 | DE3906713 | DE4126197 | DE19716855 | EP3051163 |